Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0482959

EP0482959 - System for data communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/18]For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimotsuma, Hiroshi, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Gou, Yasunao, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Ikata, Yoshikatsu, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Kimura, Toshiyuki, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Kawagoe Works, 25-1, Aza-Nishicho, Oaza-Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1992/18]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam , et al
Gill Jennings & Every The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/31]Flint, Adam , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1992/18]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date91309911.525.10.1991
[1992/18]
Priority number, dateJP1990028822525.10.1990         Original published format: JP 28822590
[1992/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0482959
Date:29.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0482959
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0482959
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/40, H04L12/28
[1992/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/18]
TitleGerman:System zur Datenübertragung[1992/18]
English:System for data communication[1992/18]
French:Système de communication de données[1992/18]
Examination procedure30.11.1993Examination requested  [1994/05]
20.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.1999Date of oral proceedings
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2000Fee for grant paid
30.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4829385  (TAKEZAWA KATSUHITO [JP]);
 [A]GB2162978  (THORN EMI FERGUSON);
 [A]EP0272877  (IBM [US])
 [Y]  IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS vol. CE-31, no. 3, August 1985, NEW YORK US pages 516 - 525 M. INOUE ET AL. 'A home automation system',
ExaminationEP0315158