Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0485197

EP0485197 - Polymers and their use for ophthalmic lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.1997
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.1997 [1997/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NESTLE S.A.
Avenue Nestle 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [1994/44]For all designated states
NESTLE S.A.
Avenue Nestle 55
CH-1800 Vevey / CH
Former [1992/20]For all designated states
NESTLE SA
Avenue Nestle 55
CH-1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Namdaran, Farhad Hod
6129 139th Place SE
Bellevue, WA 98006 / US
02 / Lebeouf, Albert Raymond
7861 Mahonia Drive
Fort Worth, Texas 76133 / US
[1992/20]
Representative(s)Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/20]Woodcraft, David Charles , et al
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London, WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date91310271.106.11.1991
[1992/20]
Priority number, dateUS1990060986307.11.1990         Original published format: US 609863
[1992/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0485197
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0485197
Date:02.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/30, C08F220/34, C08F220/38, C08F220/18, G02B1/04
[1992/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/20]
TitleGerman:Polymere und ihre Verwendung für opthalmische Linsen[1992/20]
English:Polymers and their use for ophthalmic lenses[1992/20]
French:Polymères et leur utilisation pour lentilles opthalmiques[1992/20]
Examination procedure04.08.1992Examination requested  [1992/40]
21.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.04.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.1996Fee for grant paid
24.06.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JP63109866  ;
 [X]EP0142921  ;
 [X]GB2089523  ;
 [X]EP0109073
 [A]  - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL Section Ch, Week 8825, 17 August 1988 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, Page 0556, AN 88-171791/25 & JP-A-63 109 866 (TOYO CONTACT LENS) 14 May 1988, & JP63109866 A 19880514