Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0485212 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0485212



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2257
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
02.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
14.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.09.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.08.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.08.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.08.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
26.08.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
26.08.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.08.2009 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 55
27.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
15.04.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.04.2009 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
01.04.2009 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
25.03.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.12.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2008 Drawings Opposition 1
02.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
02.12.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
28.11.2008 Drawings Opposition 1
28.11.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
28.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
27.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.11.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
08.08.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
08.08.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.07.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
22.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.12.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
20.12.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
06.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 5
06.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 5
29.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.11.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 5
02.11.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 5
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 5
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 3
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 5
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 4
22.09.2004 Claims Opposition 5
22.09.2004 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.05.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.05.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.05.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
19.05.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
16.04.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
16.04.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
16.04.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
11.03.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
08.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 33
15.04.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 8
11.04.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
08.04.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.04.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.04.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.04.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.04.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.04.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
03.03.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
07.02.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 6
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.01.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2003 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
10.12.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
04.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
03.12.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.12.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.12.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.11.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.11.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
27.03.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.12.2000 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
28.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
10.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.05.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.04.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
07.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
11.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.01.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
07.12.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.12.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.12.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.12.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.12.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.12.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.12.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 5
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 3
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 6
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Claims Appeal 4
01.12.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.12.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.12.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.12.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
27.11.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 70
14.10.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.10.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1998 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
28.09.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
28.09.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.09.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
04.08.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.08.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.07.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.07.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.07.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.07.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
23.07.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
23.07.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
23.07.1998 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
23.07.1998 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
23.07.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
23.07.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
26.06.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
26.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.06.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.06.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
25.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
25.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
25.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
25.06.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
24.06.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
24.06.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
10.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.06.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.06.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 5
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 3
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 6
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Claims Opposition 5
02.06.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
29.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
27.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 53
20.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
19.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
08.05.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.05.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.05.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.05.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.04.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.04.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.04.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.12.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.06.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.06.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.06.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.06.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.06.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.06.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.06.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.06.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.06.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
23.06.1997 Authorisation Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
23.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.06.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.06.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.04.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.04.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.03.1997 Claims Opposition 3
13.03.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
11.03.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
17.01.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
25.11.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.11.1996 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
22.11.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
13.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
02.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.07.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.06.1996 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
07.06.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
28.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
17.05.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.05.1996 N/A Opposition 1
09.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
07.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
07.05.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.05.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
02.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
29.04.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
29.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
29.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
29.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
29.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
26.04.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
25.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
25.04.1996 N/A Opposition 1
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.04.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
18.04.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
18.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
18.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.04.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
12.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
12.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
12.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
12.04.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
09.06.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.01.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
30.01.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.01.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
13.01.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.12.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.11.1994 Annex Search / examination 1
30.11.1994 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.10.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.10.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
26.09.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
07.09.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
07.09.1994 Description Search / examination 5
07.09.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.08.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.07.1994 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
15.06.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.05.1994 Claims Search / examination 5
27.05.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.05.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.05.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
14.03.1994 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.03.1994 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
10.02.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.02.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.12.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.07.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.11.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
02.10.1992 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
13.04.1992 Annex Search / examination 1
13.04.1992 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.03.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.1992 European search report Search / examination 3
03.01.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.01.1992 Priority document Search / examination 22
07.11.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.11.1991 Claims Search / examination 6
07.11.1991 Description Search / examination 18
07.11.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.11.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6