blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0487308 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0487308



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 289
06.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.07.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
13.07.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.05.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
03.05.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.03.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
03.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
03.11.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.11.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
02.07.1998 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
16.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
16.06.1998 Description Search / examination 6
16.06.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
16.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
08.04.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.01.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
25.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
25.06.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
25.06.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.06.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
23.04.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.04.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.12.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.11.1996 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.11.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.1996 Description Search / examination 2
08.11.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.11.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
29.08.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.06.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.01.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.12.1995 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
27.11.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.1995 Description Search / examination 2
27.11.1995 Drawings Search / examination 1
27.11.1995 Drawings Search / examination 1
27.11.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.11.1995 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.07.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.07.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.02.1995 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.1995 General enquiry Search / examination 1
29.07.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.07.1992 European search report Search / examination 2
23.07.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.07.1992 Translation of priority document Search / examination 15
23.07.1992 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
23.06.1992 Deficiencies in translation of international application Search / examination 1
06.06.1992 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
28.02.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.02.1992 Priority document Search / examination 22
28.02.1992 Priority document Search / examination 15
19.11.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.11.1991 Claims Search / examination 5
19.11.1991 Description Search / examination 15
19.11.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.1991 Drawings Search / examination 7
19.11.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.11.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6