blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0487308


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.12.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.01.2008  [2008/02]
17.02.2006 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
12.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2001 [2001/09]
24.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
11.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
30.11.1999 Renewal fee
29.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.12.1998 Renewal fee
29.10.1998 Communication of intention to grant
29.06.1998 Change - request for further processing
26.06.1998 Change - request for further processing
23.06.1998 Examination report or reply
23.06.1998 Change - request for further processing
02.04.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn
02.01.1998 Examination report or reply
28.11.1997 Renewal fee
27.08.1997 Examination report or reply
01.07.1997 Examination report or reply
19.04.1997 Examination report or reply
07.12.1996 Examination report or reply
28.11.1996 Renewal fee
19.11.1996 Change - request for further processing
15.11.1996 Change - request for further processing
14.11.1996 Examination report or reply
11.11.1996 Change - request for further processing
27.08.1996 Application deemed to be withdrawn
01.06.1996 Examination report or reply
18.01.1996 Examination report or reply
21.12.1995 Change - request for further processing
16.03.1995 First examination report
10.02.1993 Request for examination filed published on  31.03.1993 [1993/13]
28.07.1992 Publication of search report published on  16.09.1992 [1992/38]
10.04.1992 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.05.1992 [1992/22]