blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0487308
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3210006B 17.09.2001B2
JPH04188956 07.07.1992A
Priority number Date
JP31898490 21.11.1990
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3278152B 30.04.2002B2
JPH04188947 07.07.1992A
Priority number Date
JP31898390 21.11.1990
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6088476 11.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US27435894 13.07.1994
JP31898390 21.11.1990
JP31898490 21.11.1990
US79400591 19.11.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0487308Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0487308 16.09.1992A3
EP0487308 27.05.1992A2
Priority number Date
JP31898390 21.11.1990
JP31898490 21.11.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69131937D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP31898390 21.11.1990
JP31898490 21.11.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69131937T 15.06.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP31898390 21.11.1990
JP31898490 21.11.1990