blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0487308

Designated contracting states DE 
 FRLapse: 26.01.2000
 GB 
 ITLapse: 26.01.2000
Examination procedure21.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted26.01.2000
Opposition procedure27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit published on 10.01.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.05.1992 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:16.09.1992 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:31.03.1993 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19930201
 
Event date:03.05.1995 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19950322
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000126
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000126
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:02.03.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69131937
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000302
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:23.06.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20071130
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20071112
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:29.07.2009 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20081119
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090603
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081119