Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0487308

EP0487308 - Color image communication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/22]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimamura, Yasuhito, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1992/22]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/22]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date91310660.519.11.1991
[1992/22]
Priority number, dateJP1990031898321.11.1990         Original published format: JP 31898390
JP1990031898421.11.1990         Original published format: JP 31898490
[1992/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0487308
Date:27.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0487308
Date:16.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0487308
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/40, H04N1/32
[1992/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/22]
TitleGerman:Farbbildübertragung[1992/22]
English:Color image communication[1992/22]
French:Communication d'images au couleurs[1992/22]
Examination procedure01.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/13]
22.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.1999Fee for grant paid
21.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Request for further processing for:15.06.1998Request for further processing filed
16.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.07.1998Decision despatched
07.11.1996Request for further processing filed
07.11.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
21.11.1996Decision despatched
27.11.1995Request for further processing filed
27.11.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
12.12.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.01.2000
IT26.01.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2006/14]FR26.01.2000
Former [2001/09]FR23.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US3622699  (RICHESON WILLIAM E JR);
 [A]EP0355838  (CANON KK [JP]);
 [AP]EP0451722  (CANON KK [JP])