blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0487350

EP0487350 - Coated receiver sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1992/22]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oliver, John F.
1293 Prince Albert Court
Mississauga, Ontario / CA
02 / Sandborn, Richard F.
52 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto, Ontario / CA
[1992/22]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1997/29]Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al
Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Former [1992/22]Johnson, Reginald George, et al
Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway
Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date91310759.521.11.1991
[1992/22]
Priority number, dateUS1990061646621.11.1990         Original published format: US 616466
[1992/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0487350
Date:27.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0487350
Date:13.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0487350
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.1992
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/00
[1992/22]
CPC:
B41M5/5254 (EP,US); B41M5/52 (EP,US); B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US); Y10T428/259 (EP,US); Y10T428/264 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US); Y10T428/31533 (EP,US); Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31902 (EP,US); Y10T428/3192 (EP,US); Y10T428/31928 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/22]
TitleGerman:Beschichtete Aufzeichnungsfolie[1992/22]
English:Coated receiver sheets[1992/22]
French:Feuilles réceptrices revêtues[1992/22]
Examination procedure05.11.1992Examination requested  [1992/53]
21.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.1995Fee for grant paid
16.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.12.1996  07.01.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Sihl GmbH
Kreuzauerstrasse 33
52355 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
Sternagel, Hans-Günther
Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  13.12.1996  15.01.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Felix Schoeller Jr. GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
D-49086 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Minderop, Ralph H.
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.12.1996  07.01.1997  ADMISSIBLE
OJI PAPER COMPANY, LIMITED
7-5, Ginza 4- chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP
Opponent's representative
Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1997/07]
Opponent(s)01  13.12.1996    ADMISSIBLE
Sihl GmbH
Kreuzauerstrasse 33
52355 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
Sternagel, Hans-Günther
Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  13.12.1996   
Felix Schoeller Jr. GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
D-49086 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Minderop, Ralph H.
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.12.1996   
OJI PAPER COMPANY, LIMITED
7-5, Ginza 4- chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP
Opponent's representative
Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
20.01.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.10.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.02.2000Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.03.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
24.10.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.10.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.04.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.08.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.05.2000Appeal received No.  T0593/00
04.07.2000Statement of grounds filed
24.10.2002Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
24.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP59192589  ;
 [A]EP0390638  (ARJOMARI PRIOUX [FR]);
 [XP]EP0444950  (XEROX CORP [US])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 57 (M-363)(1780) 13 March 1985 & JP-A-59 192 589 ( MATSUSHITA ) 31 October 1984, & JP59192589 A 19841031
OppositionDE3707627
 DE3510565
 EP0174859
 JPS61188183
 US4474847
 DE3016766
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.