Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0441709

EP0441709 - Semiconductor laser driving circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.1997
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.1997 [1997/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COPAL COMPANY LIMITED
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/33]For all designated states
COPAL COMPANY LIMITED
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshikawa, Yukio
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
02 / Ishii, Takeshi
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
03 / Oyama, Yoshihiro
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
04 / Sasaki, Tatsuo
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
05 / Takahashi, Tamotsu
2-16-20, Shimura, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174 / JP
06 / Sato, Shinichi
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
07 / Moriya, Kazumasa
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
08 / Shinoda, Ichiro
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
09 / Itoh, Motohiko
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
10 / Kashiwazaki, Tomoyuki
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
11 / Kawai, Hiroaki
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
12 / Watanabe, Mitsuo
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1991/33]
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/33]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date91400295.107.02.1991
[1991/33]
Priority number, dateJP1990002909807.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2909890
JP1990002909907.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2909990
JP1990002910007.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2910090
JP1990002910107.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2910190
JP1990002910207.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2910290
JP1990002910307.02.1990         Original published format: JP 2910390
JP1990011366027.04.1990         Original published format: JP 11366090
[1991/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0441709
Date:14.08.1991
Language:EN
[1991/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0441709
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0441709
Date:18.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/133, H01S3/10, G06K7/10
[1991/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/33]
TitleGerman:Treiberschaltung für Halbleiterlaser[1991/33]
English:Semiconductor laser driving circuit[1991/33]
French:Circuit de commande pour laser à semi-conducteur[1991/33]
Examination procedure08.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/36]
07.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.03.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.1996Fee for grant paid
10.06.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:SearchJP01236387  [ ];
 JP63043386  [ ];
 EP0248646  [ ];
 EP0083452  [ ];
 EP0296427  [ ];
 US4751743  [ ];
 DE2214958  [ ]
    [ ] - Technical Digest of the European Conference on Optical Communication 1987, Volume 1, pages 453-456, 1987, whole document.
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 18, No. 566 (P-976) 15 December 1989; & JP,A,01 236 387 (FUJITSU LTD.) 21 September 1989, Abstract., & JP01236387 A 19890921
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 256 (E-635) 19 July 1988; & JP,A,63 043 386 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO. LTD.) 24 February 1988, Abstract., & JP63043386 A 19880224