Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0451006


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.10.1996 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.11.1996 [1996/47]
13.10.1995 (Expected) grant published on  29.11.1995 [1995/48]
30.11.1994 Change - representative published on  18.01.1995 [1995/03]
08.02.1994 First examination report
12.12.1991 Request for examination filed published on  29.01.1992 [1992/05]
23.08.1991 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.10.1991 [1991/41]