Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04227893 | ![]() | 17.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0451006 | ![]() | 29.11.1995 | B1 | EP0451006 | 09.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9101322 | 26.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2039333 | 18.06.2002 | C | CA2039333 | 03.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69114889T | 04.07.1996 | T2 | DE69114889D1 | 11.01.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0451006T | 27.12.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2082162T | 16.03.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2660218 | 05.06.1992 | B1 | FR2660218 | 04.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3018255T | 29.02.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE74218 | 16.07.1997 | B1 | IE911080 | 09.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100187307B | 01.04.1999 | B1 | KR910018094 | 30.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT97219 | 31.07.1998 | B | PT97219 | 31.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2070548 | 20.12.1996 | C1 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR25632 | 01.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA27700 | 16.10.2000 | C2 | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5177305 | 05.01.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9004165 | 02.04.1990 |