Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0451006

Designated contracting states BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 GB 
 GR 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure16.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted29.11.1995
Opposition procedure30.08.1996No opposition filed within time limit published on 20.11.1996 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.11.1996 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:09.10.1991 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:29.11.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:29.01.1992 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19911128
 
Event date:30.03.1994 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19940211
 
Event date:16.10.1995 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:11.01.1996 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69114889
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19960111
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:03.01.1996 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:19951130
 
Event date:27.12.1995 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:31.01.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR FG4A
Code Expl.:+VALIDATION IN GREECE
Free Format Text:3018255
 
Event date:15.02.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE
 
Event date:16.03.1996 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2082162 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:27.02.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20070227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.03.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20070227
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:25.06.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:PICHAT, PHILIPPE
Free Format Text:PICHAT, PHILIPPE#18, RUE DES TOURNELLES#F-75004 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- PICHAT, PHILIPPE#18, RUE DES TOURNELLES#F-75004 PARIS (FR)
 
Event date:03.11.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080331
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081002
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20100219
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20100309
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20100224
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20100312
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20100223
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20100226
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20100302
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20100224
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20100224
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20110319
 
Event date:03.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20110320
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
OWNER:*PICHAT PHILIPPE
Effective DATE:20110320
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20110319
 
Event date:11.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20120511
 
Event date:30.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-DISCONTINUED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20110320
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20110321
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20110320
 
Event date:20.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69114889 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:04.10.1996 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:13.10.1995 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:23.08.1991 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:04.10.1996 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261