blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0451006

EP0451006 - Process for incinerating waste [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.1996
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.11.1996 [1996/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pichat, Philippe
18, rue des Tournelles
75004 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1991/41]For all designated states
Pichat, Philippe
18, rue des Tournelles
F-75004 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1991/41]
Representative(s)Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit
7 Rue Le Sueur
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Former [1991/41]Cuer, André
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date91400742.220.03.1991
[1991/41]
Priority number, dateFR1990000416502.04.1990         Original published format: FR 9004165
[1991/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0451006
Date:09.10.1991
Language:FR
[1991/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0451006
Date:29.11.1995
Language:FR
[1995/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1991
ClassificationIPC:A62D3/00, C04B7/24
[1991/41]
CPC:
A62D3/38 (EP,US); B09B1/00 (KR); C04B7/24 (EP,US);
A62D2101/20 (EP,US); A62D2101/24 (EP,US); A62D2101/40 (EP,US);
A62D2101/43 (EP,US); Y02P40/10 (EP,US); Y10S106/01 (EP,US);
Y10S423/18 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbrennung von Abfällen[1991/41]
English:Process for incinerating waste[1991/41]
French:Procédé d'incinération de déchets[1991/41]
Examination procedure28.11.1991Examination requested  [1992/05]
11.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.1995Fee for grant paid
16.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.08.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47]
Request for further processing for:14.10.1994Request for further processing filed
25.01.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.02.1995Decision despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:25.01.1995Date of receipt
24.02.1995Request accepted
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0293982  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]);
 [A]FR2370007  (TETRONICS RES & DEV CO LTD [GB]);
 [A]EP0347240  (LAFSER FRED A [US], et al)
ExaminationEP0389320
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.