blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0475799

EP0475799 - Method and device for extracting a deformed heater rod from a pressurizer container of a nuclear pressure water reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.1994Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.03.1994 [1994/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRAMATOME
Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]For all designated states
FRAMATOME
Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Godin, Bruno
21 rue Pasteur
F-69680 Chassieu / FR
[1992/12]
Representative(s)Bouget, Lucien, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]Bouget, Lucien, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date91402181.102.08.1991
[1992/12]
Priority number, dateFR1990001118510.09.1990         Original published format: FR 9011185
[1992/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0475799
Date:18.03.1992
Language:FR
[1992/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1991
ClassificationIPC:G21C1/09, F22B37/00
[1992/12]
CPC:
F22B37/006 (EP,US); G21C1/09 (EP,US); Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49352 (EP,US); Y10T29/4973 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   LI,   SE [1992/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von einem deformierten Heizstab aus einem Druckhaltegefäss von einem Druckwasserkernreaktor[1992/12]
English:Method and device for extracting a deformed heater rod from a pressurizer container of a nuclear pressure water reactor[1992/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'extraction d'une canne chauffante présentant des déformations,d'une enveloppe de pressuriseur d'un réacteur nucléaire à eau sous pression[1992/12]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure04.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/12]
15.10.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.11.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.1994Application withdrawn by applicant  [1994/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4018346  (LESHEM ADAM, et al);
 [A]FR2329057  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0084867  (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.