Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0467805

EP0467805 - Equipment for detecting the presence of a tube and/or the presence of fluid within it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/04]Equipment for detecting the presence of a tube and/or the presence of blood within it
[1995/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.1996
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): NL
published on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOSPAL AG
Dornacherstrasse 8
4008 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1992/04]For all designated states
HOSPAL AG
Dornacherstrasse 8
CH-4008 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Paolini, Francesco
Viale Della Repubblica No. 110
I-87100 Cosenza / IT
02 / Rossi, Andrea
Via Cantone No. 92
I-46020 S.Giacomo Delle Segnate(Mantova) / IT
[1992/04]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1995/11]
Former [1992/04]Kerneis, Daniéle , et al
Hospal COT Service Brevets P.O. Box 21
F-69881 Meyzieu Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date91420251.015.07.1991
[1992/04]
Priority number, dateIT1990006755817.07.1990         Original published format: IT 6755890
[1992/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0467805
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0467805
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/36
[1992/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/04]
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung für das Vorhandensein eines Schlauches und/oder von Flüssigkeit darin[1995/11]
English:Equipment for detecting the presence of a tube and/or the presence of fluid within it[1995/11]
French:Appareil pour la détection de la présence d'un tuyau et/ou de fluide à l'intérieur de celui-ci[1995/11]
Former [1992/04]Anzeigevorrichtung für das Vorhandensein eines Rörchens und/oder von Blut darin
Former [1992/04]Equipment for detecting the presence of a tube and/or the presence of blood within it
Former [1992/04]Appareil pour la détection de la présence d'un tuyau et/ou de sang à l'intérieur de celui-ci
Examination procedure14.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/16]
22.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.09.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.1994Fee for grant paid
14.11.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.1995
BE15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
DK15.03.1995
GR15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
NL15.03.1995
SE15.06.1995
LU31.07.1995
[2003/11]
Former [2000/27]AT15.03.1995
BE15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
DK15.03.1995
GR15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
SE15.06.1995
LU31.07.1995
NL31.07.1995
Former [2000/05]AT15.03.1995
BE15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
DK15.03.1995
GR15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
SE15.06.1995
LU31.07.1995
Former [1998/15]AT15.03.1995
BE15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
DK15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
SE15.06.1995
Former [1996/04]AT15.03.1995
BE15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
SE15.06.1995
Former [1996/02]AT15.03.1995
CH15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
Former [1995/36]CH15.03.1995
LI15.03.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US3812482  (CLARK J);
 [A]WO8200591  (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]);
 [A]CH604741  (MANELLA PAUL);
 [A]DE3603442  (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE])