Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0491650

EP0491650 - Conformal composite molding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.1996
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.05.1996 [1996/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/26]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Boustead, Terry Martin
1645 Quinnipiac Avenue
New Haven, Connecticut 06513 / US
02 / Vallier, Paul Albert
109 Warner Road
Kensington, Connecticut 06037 / US
[1992/26]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1992/26]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date91630114.619.12.1991
[1992/26]
Priority number, dateUS1990062990919.12.1990         Original published format: US 629909
[1992/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0491650
Date:24.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0491650
Date:02.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0491650
Date:10.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.1992
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/44, B29C33/46, B29C33/40
[1995/19]
Former International [1992/26]B29C67/14, B29C33/46, B29C33/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/26]
TitleGerman:Anpassungsfähige Formgebung von Verbundwerkstoffen[1992/26]
English:Conformal composite molding[1992/26]
French:Moulage conformable pour composites[1992/26]
Examination procedure24.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/16]
08.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1994Fee for grant paid
08.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1629479  (INST SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE);
 [Y]FR1012578  ;
 [A]US3479666  (WEBB DANIEL D);
 [AD]EP0319449  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]);
 [AD]EP0233134  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]);
 [A]US3764641  (ASH A);
 [A]FR2343574  (ALTULOR [FR])