Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0467853

EP0467853 - Device and method for the measurement of blood pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  24.12.1997
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.1997Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 11.02.1998 [1998/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AVL Medical Instruments AG
Stettemerstrasse 28
8207 Schaffhausen / CH
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]For all designated states
AVL Medical Instruments AG
Stettemerstrasse 28
CH-8207 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [1992/04]For all designated states
Hatschek, Rudolf Alexander, Dr.
3, rue Jacques-Vogt
CH-1700 Fribourg 5 / CH
For all designated states
Heitz, Erich Willi Franz, Dr. med.
Gugerhalde 12
CH-8207 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hatschek, Rudolf A., Dr.
3, rue Jacques-Vogt
CH-1700 Fribourg / CH
[1992/04]
Representative(s)Krause, Walter , et al
Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Walter Krause, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Kliment, Singerstrasse 8, Postfach 200
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Walter Krause, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Kliment, Singerstrasse 8, Postfach 200
A-1014 Wien / AT
Former [1992/04]Eder, Carl E.
Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40
CH-4052 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date91810569.315.07.1991
[1992/04]
Priority number, dateCH1990000239018.07.1990         Original published format: CH 239090
[1992/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0467853
Date:22.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0467853
Date:10.01.1996
Language:DE
[1996/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/026, A61B5/0285, A61B8/06
[1992/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1992/04]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Blutdruckmessung[1992/04]
English:Device and method for the measurement of blood pressure[1992/04]
French:Dispositif et procédé destinés à la mesure de la pression sanguine[1992/04]
Examination procedure03.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/36]
20.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1995Fee for grant paid
27.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.09.1996  21.10.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Metrax GmbH
Rheinwaldstrasse
78628 Rottweil / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
 02  10.10.1996  22.10.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Walter Schmid
Ulmer Str. 1
88416 Ochsenhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Liska, Horst
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1996/49]
Opponent(s)01  28.09.1996   
Metrax GmbH
Rheinwaldstrasse
78628 Rottweil / DE
Opponent's representative
Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck Fleck Herrmann Patentanwälte Postfach 14 69
71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
 02  10.10.1996   
Dr. Walter Schmid
Ulmer Str. 1
88416 Ochsenhausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Liska, Horst
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
14.11.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.09.1997Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
25.09.1997Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.07.1996
CH31.07.1996
LI31.07.1996
[1998/04]
Former [1998/02]AT15.07.1996
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2523432  (JOZON MARTINE [FR]);
 [Y]DE1905620  (SIEMENS AG);
 [A]EP0027215  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]);
 [A]US4370985  (TAKEICHI HITOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]FR2481917  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR])