EP0510291 - Method of and device for manufacture of threaded cans made of aluminium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nussbaum und Guhl AG Frauenfelderstrasse 67 9548 Matzingen / CH | [2000/17] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states NUSSBAUM & GUHL AG Frauenfelderstrasse 67 9548 Matzingen / CH | ||
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states E. NUSSBAUM AG Frauenfelderstrasse 93 CH-9548 Matzingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nussbaum-Pogacnik, Thomas Eugen Neuhauserstrasse 79 CH-8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Hedwigsteig 6 Postfach 768 CH-8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810599.0 | 26.07.1991 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | CH19910001149 | 17.04.1991 Original published format: CH 114991 | [1992/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510291 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510291 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0510291 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/24, B21H3/04 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
B21D51/38 (EP,US);
B21D51/24 (EP,US);
B21H3/04 (EP,US);
B65D1/0246 (EP,US);
B65D1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Aluminiumdosen mit Gewinde | [1992/44] | English: | Method of and device for manufacture of threaded cans made of aluminium | [1992/44] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la manufacture de boîtes filetées en aluminium | [1992/44] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.1995
21.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE FRATTINI SpA Construzioni Meccaniche Via Comonte 15 24068 Seriate (BG) / IT Opponent's representative Lecce, Giovanni Lecce & Calciati S.r.l. Internazionale Brevetti Via Monte Rosa, 14 20149 Milano / IT | 02
07.12.1995
20.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE Envases UK Limited Unit 1, Christchurch Road, Baglan Industrial Park Port Talbot, West Glamorgan SA12 5BZ / GB Opponent's representative Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.1995
21.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE FRATTINI SpA Construzioni Meccaniche Via Comonte 15 24068 Seriate (BG) / IT Opponent's representative Lecce, Giovanni Dott. Giovanni Lecce & C. S.r.l. Via Fratelli Ruffini, 9 20123 Milano / IT | ||
02
07.12.1995
20.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE Envases UK Limited Unit 1, Christchurch Road, Baglan Industrial Park Port Talbot, West Glamorgan SA12 5BZ / GB Opponent's representative Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/10] | 14.12.1995 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 12.02.1996 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.02.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.07.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.1999 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/02] | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.01.2000 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.09.1997 | Appeal received No. T1008/97 | 28.11.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.09.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.09.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.09.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.03.1995 | GR | 08.03.1995 | SE | 08.06.1995 | AT | 26.07.1999 | LU | 26.07.1999 | BE | 31.07.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/51] | DK | 08.03.1995 | |
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
AT | 26.07.1999 | ||
BE | 31.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/43] | DK | 08.03.1995 | |
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
BE | 31.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 08.03.1995 | |
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 08.03.1995 | |
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 08.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3832962 (ROLLES R); | [A]GB1445758 (HUTOGEPGYAR); | [A]DD204046 (HUETTIG MANFRED, et al) |