Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0488966 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0488966



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 525
03.11.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.10.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.10.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.09.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.09.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.09.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
13.09.2000 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
25.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2000 Claims Appeal 2
18.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.08.2000 Drawings Appeal 1
10.08.2000 Drawings Appeal 1
10.08.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.04.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.04.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
18.04.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.04.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.04.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
31.03.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.03.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.03.2000 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.03.2000 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
17.03.2000 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
08.03.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
08.03.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.03.2000 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
12.11.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
28.10.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
19.10.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
25.08.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.08.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.08.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.08.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
05.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
21.04.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.04.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
01.04.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
31.03.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
29.03.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
01.03.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
26.02.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.02.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.02.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.02.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.02.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
29.01.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
27.01.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.12.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.12.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.11.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
30.11.1998 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
17.11.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
22.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.10.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
07.10.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
07.10.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
07.10.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
07.10.1998 Drawings Opposition 1
07.10.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 5
29.09.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.09.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.09.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.03.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
23.03.1998 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.03.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.03.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.03.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.03.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.10.1997 Drawings Opposition 3
14.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
13.10.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
25.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.04.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
15.04.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
04.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
23.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.12.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
12.08.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.08.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.07.1996 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
09.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
09.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
09.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
08.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
31.08.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.06.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.06.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.04.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
05.04.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.01.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.01.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
03.01.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.08.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
16.08.1994 Description Search / examination 2
16.08.1994 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
16.08.1994 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
16.08.1994 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.08.1994 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 19
16.08.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
10.08.1994 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.07.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.06.1994 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.03.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.02.1993 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.11.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.11.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.11.1992 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
10.03.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.03.1992 European search report Search / examination 2
07.03.1992 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.03.1992 Priority document Search / examination 17
07.03.1992 Translation of priority document Search / examination 13
19.12.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.12.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
19.12.1991 Description Search / examination 8
19.12.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.11.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.11.1991 Drawings Search / examination 5
26.11.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
26.11.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
26.11.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
26.11.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
26.11.1991 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 13