Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0453426

EP0453426 - Diamond rock tools for percussive and rotary crushing rock drilling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1997
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1991/43]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Waldenström, Mats
Thaliavägen 31
S-161 40 Bromma / SE
02 / Hillert, Lars
Lillängsvägen 73
S-131 41 Nacka / SE
03 / Fischer, Udo
Friherregatan 66
S-162 43 Vällingby / SE
04 / Dennis, Mahlon
3726 Rocky Woods Drive
Kingwood, Texas 77339 / US
[1991/43]
Representative(s)Östlund, Alf Olof Anders , et al
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1991/43]Östlund, Alf Olof Anders , et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
S-811 81 Sandviken / SE
Application number, filing date91850093.515.04.1991
[1991/43]
Priority number, dateUS1990051109619.04.1990         Original published format: US 511096
[1991/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0453426
Date:23.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0453426
Date:06.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/56
[1991/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1991/43]
TitleGerman:Diamantwerkzeuge zum Schlag- und Drehbohren von Gestein[1991/43]
English:Diamond rock tools for percussive and rotary crushing rock drilling[1991/43]
French:Outils diamantés pour le forage à percussion et à rotation des roches[1991/43]
Examination procedure04.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/44]
05.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.05.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
28.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.1995Fee for grant paid
31.10.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09]
Request for further processing for:02.06.1995Request for further processing filed
02.06.1995Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.06.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.03.1996
DK06.03.1996
ES06.03.1996
NL06.03.1996
[2003/07]
Former [2002/25]AT06.03.1996
DK06.03.1996
ES06.03.1996
Former [1998/15]AT06.03.1996
DK06.03.1996
Former [1997/03]AT06.03.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0029535  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]);
 [YD]US4743515  (FISCHER UDO K R [SE], et al);
 [X]GB2138864  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO);
 [X]EP0356097  (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]);
 [XD]US4764434  (ARONSSON SVEN B [SE], et al)