Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0488987

EP0488987 - Method for representing moving bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.1996
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 19.06.2002  [2002/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Truppe, Michael, Dr.
Adolfstorgasse 7
A-1130 Wien / AT
[1992/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1992/23]
Representative(s)Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt
Florianigasse 26/3
1080 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1994/03]Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Albertgasse 10/8
A-1080 Wien / AT
Former [1992/23]Kliment, Peter
Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8
A-1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date91890231.301.10.1991
[1992/23]
Priority number, dateAT1990000239726.11.1990         Original published format: AT 239790
AT1990000239826.11.1990         Original published format: AT 239890
[1992/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0488987
Date:03.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0488987
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11
[1992/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Darstellung beweglicher Körper[1992/23]
English:Method for representing moving bodies[1992/23]
French:Méthode de représentation de corps mobiles[1992/23]
Examination procedure23.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/03]
14.03.1994Request for accelerated examination filed
13.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.1994Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.1995Fee for grant paid
28.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.199303   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.1993
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.01.1996
DK31.01.1996
ES31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
LU31.10.1996
[2002/25]
Former [2000/05]BE31.01.1996
DK31.01.1996
GR31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
LU31.10.1996
Former [1998/15]BE31.01.1996
DK31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
Former [1996/51]BE31.01.1996
SE30.04.1996
Former [1996/38]SE30.04.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2545349  (DURET FRANCOIS [FR]);
 [X]EP0119660  (SNIJDER NICOLAAS ROELOF [NL])
 [A]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY. Bd. 11, 1989, US Seiten 1445 - 1446; MAEKAWA ET AL.: 'Measurement of the upper limb motion by a magnetic sensor and its application to kinesiological studies.',