blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0502092

EP0502092 - ORAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aktiebolaget DRACO
Box 34
S-221 00 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [1992/37]For all designated states
Aktiebolaget Draco
Box 34
S-221 00 Lund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ULMIUS, Jan
Planvägen 6
S-222 47 Lund / SE
[1992/37]
Representative(s)Danielsson, Sten Ove, et al
Astra AB Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Danielsson, Sten Ove, et al
AB ASTRA Patent and Trademark Department
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Former [1998/05]Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1992/37]Danielsson, Sten Ove, et al
AB ASTRA Patent and Trademark Department
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date91900414.315.11.1990
[1992/37]
WO1990SE00738
Priority number, dateSE1989000391422.11.1989         Original published format: SE 8903914
[1992/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9107172
Date:30.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0502092
Date:09.09.1992
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1992/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0502092
Date:26.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.05.1991
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/22, A61K9/52, A61K31/58
[1992/37]
CPC:
A61K9/5078 (EP,US); A61K9/20 (KR); A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US); A61K9/5047 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/37]
TitleGerman:ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG INTESTINALER ENTZÜNDLICHER KRANKHEITEN[1992/37]
English:ORAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES[1992/37]
French:PREPARATION ADMINISTREE PAR VOIE ORALE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INTESTINALES INFLAMMATOIRES[1992/37]
Entry into regional phase21.04.1992National basic fee paid 
21.04.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
21.04.1992Examination requested  [1992/37]
30.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
31.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.1995Fee for grant paid
15.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995  03.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
79108 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  26.04.1996  07.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Farmaceutisk Laboraturium Ferring A/S
c/o Ferring SAS 216 Boulevard Saint Germain
75007 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2000/27]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995  03.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
79108 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
 02  26.04.1996  07.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Farmaceutisk Laboraturium Ferring A/S
c/o Ferring SAS 216 Boulevard Saint Germain
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2000/26]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995  03.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
79108 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
 02  26.04.1996  07.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Farmaceutisk Laboraturium Ferring A/S
Indertoften 5
DK-2720 Vanlose / DK
Former [1997/17]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995  03.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
79108 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
 02  26.04.1996  07.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Farmaceutisk Laboraturium Ferring A/S
Indertoften 5
DK-2720 Vanlose / DK
Opponent's representative
Frank, Veit Peter
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1996/25]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995  03.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
79108 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
 02  26.04.1996  07.05.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Farmaceutisk Laboraturium Ferring A/S
Indertoften 5
DK-2720 Vanlose / DK
Opponent's representative
Christiansen, Ejvind
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [1995/38]
Opponent(s)01  26.07.1995   
Falk Pharma GmbH
Leinenweberstr.5
7800 Freiburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, Dr.
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
28.05.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.09.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.1997Date of oral proceedings
25.07.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.07.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.01.2001Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/15]
Appeal following opposition23.09.1997Appeal received No.  T1009/97
03.12.1997Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2001Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
18.01.2001Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8300435  (TILLOTT J B LTD [GB]);
 [Y]EP0278174  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB])
 [Y]  - Haematologia, Vol. 19, No. 41, 1986 A. KRASZNAI et al.: "Decreased Number of Steroid Receptors of Circulating Lymphocytes in Crohn's Disease and Ulcerative Colitis", see page 299 - page 301 see esp. p. 300, fig. 1, 1. 4.
 [X]  - Scandinavian Journal of Gastroenterology Supplement, Vol. 24, No. 15, 1989 S.L. WOLMAN: "Use of Oral Budesonide in a Patient with Small Bowel Crohn's Disease and Previous Pseudotumor Cerebri Secondary to Steroids", see page 146 - page 147 see esp. 1. 16-17.
 [A]  - Dialog Information Services, file 155, Medline, accession No. 05787468, THOMAS P. et al: "Absorption of delayed-release prednisolone in ulcerative colitis and Crohn's disease", & J Pharm Pharmacol; 37 (10) p757-8.
 [A]  - Scandinavian Journal of Gastroenterology, Vol. 22, 1987 A. DANIELSSON et al.: "A Controlled Randomized Trial of Budesonide versus Prednisolone Retention Enemas in Active Distal Ulcerative Colitis", see page 987 - page 992.
 [A]  - STN International, file MEDLINE, STN accession No. 83226746, GAMSTADT A. et al: "Effect of betamethasone treatment on iodothyronines and thyroid hormone-binding proteins during controlled nutrition. A study on patients with chronic inflammatory bowel disease, Acta Endocrinol (Copenh), (1983 Jun) 103 (2) 188-91.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.