Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0502092 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0502092



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1488
02.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
22.02.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.02.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.02.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.02.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
01.02.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.02.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.02.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.01.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 34
18.01.2001 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
17.01.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.01.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.01.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.12.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 23
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 11
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 11
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2000 Claims Appeal 11
18.12.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.12.2000 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.12.2000 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.12.2000 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
15.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.11.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
14.11.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
14.11.2000 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
28.06.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.06.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
20.06.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.06.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.06.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.06.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.06.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.05.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
30.05.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.05.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
26.05.2000 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.05.2000 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.05.2000 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.05.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.05.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.05.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
25.05.2000 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.05.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.05.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
18.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
18.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
16.05.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
16.05.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.05.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
15.05.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2000 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.05.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
09.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.05.2000 Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative Appeal 1
04.05.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.05.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.04.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.04.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.04.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
20.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
18.04.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.04.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.04.2000 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
14.01.2000 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.09.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.09.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
13.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.08.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
07.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.07.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
07.07.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.06.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.06.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.06.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
29.05.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.04.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
08.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.04.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.04.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
17.12.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.12.1997 Invitation to file an authorisation Appeal 1
15.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.12.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.12.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.12.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.12.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
17.10.1997 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
08.10.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.10.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.10.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.10.1997 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
23.09.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.09.1997 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Appeal 1
13.08.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.08.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
25.07.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
25.07.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
25.07.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
25.07.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
25.07.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
25.07.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
25.07.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
13.06.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
13.06.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
13.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.06.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
12.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
12.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
12.06.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
11.06.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.06.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.06.1997 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
09.06.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
09.06.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
09.06.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
09.06.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.06.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.05.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 5
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 6
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 5
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 5
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 4
12.05.1997 Claims Opposition 5
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
12.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
12.05.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 32
09.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
09.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
09.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.05.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.05.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1997 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
25.04.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
25.04.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.04.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.04.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
25.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
25.03.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
18.03.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.03.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.03.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.03.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
10.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
06.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.03.1997 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
27.02.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
27.02.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.02.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
19.02.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.02.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.10.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.10.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.10.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.10.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
28.05.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.05.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.05.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
08.05.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.05.1996 N/A Opposition 1
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.04.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 86
30.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
30.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 36
26.04.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 44
03.08.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.07.1995 Authorisation Opposition 1
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
11.07.1995 Communication regarding a request to amend/correct the documents for grant Search / examination 1
26.06.1995 Request for correction Search / examination 1
15.06.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.04.1995 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.04.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.04.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
15.04.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
15.04.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
15.04.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
31.01.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
22.12.1994 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
19.12.1994 Description Search / examination 2
19.12.1994 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.12.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
15.12.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 9
15.12.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 16
15.12.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
15.12.1994 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
26.08.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.08.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 62
04.08.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
28.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 12
28.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
30.11.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.07.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.05.1992 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.05.1992 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
21.04.1992 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.1992 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
21.04.1992 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
05.03.1992 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
05.03.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.08.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.07.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.05.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
30.05.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 40
30.05.1991 Priority document Search / examination 40
18.12.1990 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
15.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
15.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
15.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
15.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6