Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0506757 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0506757



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1546
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Opposition 1
16.09.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
16.09.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.09.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
29.07.2005 Claims Opposition 2
29.07.2005 Claims Opposition 2
29.07.2005 Description Opposition 2
29.07.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 16
08.06.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
08.06.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 6
03.06.2005 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Opposition 1
09.05.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
21.02.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 15
28.01.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.11.2004 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
07.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
07.10.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.10.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
29.09.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.09.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2004 Claims Appeal 2
07.09.2004 Claims Appeal 1
07.09.2004 Claims Appeal 2
07.09.2004 Claims Appeal 2
07.09.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.07.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 5
27.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.11.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.11.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.11.2003 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 2
17.11.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2003 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
24.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.09.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
12.08.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 79
12.08.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.08.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
12.08.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 98
12.08.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
12.08.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.08.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
12.08.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
01.07.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.06.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.06.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.05.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.04.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.04.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 10
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
04.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
04.04.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
04.04.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
04.04.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
04.04.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2003 Non-scannable object Opposition 12
04.04.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
17.01.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
17.01.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
17.01.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Claims Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
04.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
25.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.11.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
22.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
22.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.11.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
14.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
05.08.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
31.07.2002 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.07.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.07.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.07.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
10.07.2002 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.2001 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
05.12.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.12.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.12.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.11.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
26.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
23.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2001 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
09.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
05.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.10.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.08.2000 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
13.07.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 2
04.07.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.12.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.12.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
15.12.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 28
22.11.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.11.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.10.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.1999 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
04.10.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
27.09.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 3
26.07.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
02.07.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.07.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.07.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.06.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
31.05.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.05.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
31.05.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
31.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
31.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
31.05.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 98
26.05.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
26.05.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
16.07.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.04.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.04.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.04.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.02.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
23.01.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.11.1997 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
20.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
22.09.1997 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 4
28.07.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.07.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
23.06.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
04.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
04.02.1997 Description Search / examination 1
04.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.08.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
21.08.1996 Description Search / examination 1
21.08.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.06.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.06.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
04.06.1996 Description Search / examination 1
04.06.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.05.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.05.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.05.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.04.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
18.03.1996 Description Search / examination 5
18.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
17.11.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.06.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.06.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
01.12.1994 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.10.1994 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 12
26.08.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.06.1992 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
25.06.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.06.1992 Annex Search / examination 3
09.06.1992 Annex Search / examination 44
09.06.1992 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
03.04.1992 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
03.04.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.01.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.08.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.07.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.06.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
27.06.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 38
27.06.1991 Priority document Search / examination 30
28.01.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1