EP0517707 - PROCESS FOR LACQUERING VEHICLE BODIES AND AQUEOUS LACQUERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states BASF Coatings Aktiengesellschaft Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states BASF Lacke + Farben AG Glasuritstrasse 1 D-48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEGNER, Egon, Dr. Eickenbecker Strasse 53 D-4406 Drensteinfurt 3 / DE | 02 /
POTH, Ulrich Albachtener Strasse 97 d D-4400 Münster / DE | 03 /
GROSS, Lutz-Werner, Dr. Josef Paris Strasse 6 D-4358 Haltern / DE | 04 /
WEIDEMEIER, Klaus Liebigweg 9a D-4400 Münster / DE | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Münch, Volker Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Münch, Volker, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1992/51] | Münch, Volker, Dr. BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation, Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 91902387.9 | 21.01.1991 | [1992/51] | WO1991EP00110 | Priority number, date | DE19904005961 | 26.02.1990 Original published format: DE 4005961 | [1992/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9112899 | Date: | 05.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517707 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517707 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/16, C09D175/04 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B05D7/576 (EP);
B05D7/577 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D175/04, C08L2666/16 (EP);
C09D175/04, C08L2666/18 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LACKIERUNG VON FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIEN UND WÄSSRIGE LACKE | [1992/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR LACQUERING VEHICLE BODIES AND AQUEOUS LACQUERS | [1992/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE LAQUAGE DE CARROSSERIES DE VEHICULES ET LAQUES AQUEUSES | [1992/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Vianova Resins GmbH & Co. KG Boelckestrasse 26 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE Opponent's representative Zounek, Nikolai, et al, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Vianova Resins GmbH & Co. KG Boelckestrasse 26 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE Opponent's representative Zounek, Nikolai, et al, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Vianova Resins GmbH & Co. KG Boelckestrasse 26 55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE Opponent's representative Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek Industriepark Kalle-Albert Gebäude H287 Rheingaustrasse 190 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Vianova Resins GmbH & Co.KG Patent- und Lizenz-Abteilung 65174 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek Industriepark Kalle-Albert Gebäude H287 Rheingaustrasse 190 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Standort Kalle-Albert D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek Industriepark Kalle-Albert Gebäude H287 Rheingaustrasse 190 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1995/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.04.1995
03.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Standort Kalle-Albert D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | 19.05.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.05.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/34] | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 15.05.1996 | Appeal received No. T0437/96 | 19.07.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.06.2000 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 29.06.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 29.05.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2000 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0089497 ; | [X]EP0278394 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [X]EP0299148 (BASF CORP [US]); | [X]EP0330139 (HERBERTS & CO GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0339433 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]); | [X]WO9001041 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]); | [X]DE3828157 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |