Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0466888

EP0466888 - IMPELLER PUMP OF CLEANING LIQUID FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  05.06.1998
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FICO TRANSPAR, S.A.
Avenida Castellbisbal
E-08191 Rubi / ES
[1993/48]
Former [1992/04]For all designated states
TRANSPAR IBERICA, S.A., (Société de droit espagnol)
Avenida. Castellbisbal s/n
E-08191 Rubi / ES
Inventor(s)01 / MOTA LOPEZ, Miguel
Calle Magin Ramentol, 22
E-08191 Rubi / ES
02 / MORALES GARCIA, José, Luis
Calle Murcia, 41
E-08027 Barcelona / ES
[1992/04]
Representative(s)Marx, Lothar , et al
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Postfach 86 02 45
81629 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/48]Marx, Lothar, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16
D-81677 München / DE
Former [1992/04]Marx, Lothar, Dr.
Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16
D-81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date91903641.830.01.1991
[1992/04]
WO1991ES00007
Priority number, dateES1990000033105.02.1990         Original published format: ES 9000331
[1992/04]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9111350
Date:08.08.1991
[1991/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0466888
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0466888
Date:16.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.09.1991
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/48, F04D29/62, F04D13/00
[1992/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/34]
Former [1992/04]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEITSDRUCKPUMPE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[1992/04]
English:IMPELLER PUMP OF CLEANING LIQUID FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[1992/04]
French:POMPE A IMPULSIONS DE LIQUIDE DE NETTOYAGE POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[1992/04]
Entry into regional phase31.10.1991Translation filed 
01.10.1991National basic fee paid 
01.10.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1991Examination requested  [1992/04]
01.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.09.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1993Fee for grant paid
15.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.12.1994  30.12.1994  ADMISSIBLE
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
D-60326 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas, et al
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/09]
Opponent(s)01  15.12.1994  30.12.1994  ADMISSIBLE
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
D-60326 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al
Sodener Strasse 9
D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE
Former [1995/08]
Opponent(s)01  14.12.1994  30.12.1994  ADMISSIBLE
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
D-60326 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al
Sodener Strasse 9
D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE
Former [1995/06]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.1994   
VDO Adolf Schindling AG
Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22
D-60326 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al
Sodener Strasse 9
D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE
16.01.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.06.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.12.1995Date of oral proceedings
28.12.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.04.1998Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/30]
03.06.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.02.1996Appeal received No.  T0191/96
26.04.1996Statement of grounds filed
02.04.1998Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
02.04.1998Date of oral proceedings
20.04.1998Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational searchDE2748165  [ ] (HELPHOS AUTOLICHT SCHARDMUELLE);
 FR2462594  [ ] (TRANSPAR IBERICA SA [ES]);
 DE2060608  [ ] (MCCORD CORP);
 DE1653726  [ ] (HOLLESENS FABRIKKER A S H);
 FR2495238  [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 DE3612389  [ ] (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]);
 EP0027077  [ ] (DBA SA [FR]);
 DE1962059  [ ] (SEIFERT GERD DIPL ING DR);
 DE1580477  [ ] (NIPPON DENSO CO)