Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0466888 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0466888



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 554
15.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.06.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.06.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.06.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
20.04.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.04.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.04.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
02.04.1998 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
03.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.08.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.08.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.08.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.08.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
24.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
23.07.1997 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
21.08.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.08.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
21.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.06.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.05.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.04.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
19.03.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.03.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.03.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.02.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.01.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.01.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.12.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.12.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.12.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.12.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.12.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
28.12.1995 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
28.12.1995 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
28.12.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
28.12.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
28.12.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
14.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.11.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.11.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.11.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.08.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.08.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.08.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.08.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.08.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
23.08.1995 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
23.08.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.08.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.08.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
19.05.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.05.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.05.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
16.01.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.12.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
03.02.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.12.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.12.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.12.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.10.1993 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
28.09.1993 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
28.09.1993 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
15.09.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
13.09.1993 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.09.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.09.1993 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
02.07.1993 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 2
01.06.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.06.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
19.05.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
13.11.1991 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.10.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
31.10.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
31.10.1991 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
30.10.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.10.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.10.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.10.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
01.10.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
01.10.1991 Translation of priority document Search / examination 25
26.09.1991 General enquiry Search / examination 3
12.09.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
12.09.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
12.09.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
05.09.1991 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.08.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28
08.08.1991 Priority document Search / examination 36
26.02.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 38
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 38
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
30.01.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3