Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0515682

EP0515682 - THIN FILM OF LITHIUM NIOBATE SINGLE CRYSTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kanda-cho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/49]For all designated states
IBIDEN CO., LTD.
1, Kanda-cho 2-chome
Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OONO, Satoshi
Ibiden Co., Ltd., 1-1, Kitakata, Ibigawa-cho
Ibi-gun, Gifu-ken 501-06 / JP
[1992/49]
Representative(s)Kraus, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/49]Kraus, Walter, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date91903701.001.02.1991
[1992/49]
WO1991JP00126
Priority number, dateJP1990033026230.11.1990         Original published format: JP 33026290
[1992/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9209917
Date:11.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0515682
Date:02.12.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992
[1992/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0515682
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.06.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/35, G02F1/37, C30B29/30
[1992/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [1992/49]
TitleGerman:DÜNNER FILM EINES LITHIUMNIOBAT-EINKRISTALLS[1992/49]
English:THIN FILM OF LITHIUM NIOBATE SINGLE CRYSTAL[1992/49]
French:COUCHE MINCE DE MONOCRISTAL DE NIOBATE DE LITHIUM[1992/49]
Entry into regional phase12.12.1991Translation filed 
12.12.1991National basic fee paid 
12.12.1991Search fee paid 
12.12.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/49]
08.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
18.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JP02018395  ;
 [E]EP0444209  (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP])
 [XD]  - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH. vol. 84, 1987, AMSTERDAM NL pages 409 - 412 NEURGAONKAR ET AL 'epitaxial growth of ferroelectric films for optoelectronic (saw) applications'
 [A]  - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH. vol. 46, no. 5, May 1979, AMSTERDAM NL pages 607 - 609 SUGII ET AL 'direct measurement of temperature dependence of lattice mismatches between LPE-growth Li(Nb,Ta)O3 film and LiTaO3 substrate'
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 146 (C-704)(4089) 20 May 1990 & JP-A-02 018 395 ( HITACHI METALS LTD ) 22 January 1990, & JP02018395 A 19900122 )
International search[Y]JPH0212135  (IBIDEN CO LTD);
 [Y]US4093781  (HEINZ DAVID M, et al);
 [Y]JPS52125286  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO)
ExaminationJPH0212135