Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0507886

EP0507886 - TRACHEAL TUBE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.1996
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.04.1996 [1996/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smiths Industries Public Limited Company
765, Finchley Road
London, NW11 8DS / GB
For all designated states
University of Leeds Industrial Services Ltd.
175 Woodhouse Lane Leeds LS2 3AR
West Yorkshire / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/42]For all designated states
Smiths Industries Public Limited Company
765, Finchley Road
London, NW11 8DS / GB
For all designated states
University of Leeds Industrial Services Ltd.
175 Woodhouse Lane
Leeds LS2 3AR, West Yorkshire / GB
Inventor(s)01 / INGLIS, Timothy John Jay
3 Talbot Grove, Roundhay
Leeds LS8 1AB / GB
02 / MILLAR, Michael Ronald
Beech Corner, Shawford
Wincester SO21 2AA / GB
[1992/42]
Representative(s)Flint, Jonathan McNeill
765 Finchley Road
London NW11 8DS / GB
[1992/42]
Application number, filing date91904395.015.02.1991
[1992/42]
WO1991GB00234
Priority number, dateGB1990000385721.02.1990         Original published format: GB 9003857
GB1990000385921.02.1990         Original published format: GB 9003859
[1992/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9112844
Date:05.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0507886
Date:14.10.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991
[1992/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0507886
Date:26.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.09.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/04
[1992/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1992/42]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENGESETZTER TRACHEALTUBUS[1992/42]
English:TRACHEAL TUBE ASSEMBLIES[1992/42]
French:ENSEMBLE FORMANT UN TUBE TRACHEAL[1992/42]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1991National basic fee paid 
23.12.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
23.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/42]
10.05.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.10.1994Fee for grant paid
25.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16]
Request for further processing for:22.11.1994Request for further processing filed
25.10.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.1995Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational searchUS2923299  [ ];
 EP0037719  [ ]