Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0516699

EP0516699 - STEROID ELUTING CUFF ELECTRODE FOR PERIPHERAL NERVE STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  05.09.1997
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.1997Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 22.10.1997 [1997/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis
Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/50]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Philip
6461 Crackleberry Trail
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
02 / GATES, James
9695 106th Avenue N.
Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US
03 / STOKES, Kenneth, B.
7657 Unity Avenue N.
Brooklyn Park, MN 55443 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Gary
7730 156th Avenue N.W.
Ramsey, MN 55303 / US
[1992/50]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/50]Tomlinson, Kerry John
Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date91904930.406.02.1991
[1992/50]
WO1991US00810
Priority number, dateUS1990048345522.02.1990         Original published format: US 483455
[1992/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9112850
Date:05.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0516699
Date:09.12.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.09.1991
[1992/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0516699
Date:24.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.09.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05
[1992/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1992/50]
TitleGerman:STEROID ABSONDERNDE MANSCHETTENELEKTRODE FÜR DIE STIMULATION EINES PERIPHEREN NERVEN[1994/34]
English:STEROID ELUTING CUFF ELECTRODE FOR PERIPHERAL NERVE STIMULATION[1992/50]
French:ELECTRODE A MANCHETTE POUR L'ELUTION D'UN STEROID SERVANT A STIMULER UN NERF PERIPHERIQUE[1994/34]
Former [1992/50]STEROID-ELUIERENDE MANSCHETT-ELEKTRODE FÜR PERIPHERALE NERVENSTIMULATION
Former [1992/50]ELECTRODE A MANCHETTE POUR L'ELUTION D'UN STEROIDE SERVANT A STIMULER UN NERF PERIPHERIQUE
Entry into regional phase29.06.1992National basic fee paid 
29.06.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
30.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/50]
19.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.1994Fee for grant paid
27.04.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.05.1995  08.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Biotronik GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Christiansen, Henning
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/29]
Opponent(s)01  24.05.1995  08.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Biotronik Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45
D-14195 Berlin / DE
26.06.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.01.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.1997Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
02.06.1997Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8803821  ;
 [X]US4602624  ;
 [Y]US3654933  ;
 [Y]EP0322098  ;
 [A]US4341221  ;
 [A]US4819662