blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0557279

EP0557279 - REFRIGERANT WORKING FLUIDS INCLUDING LUBRICANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/35]LUBRICANT FOR REFRIGERANT HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS
[1996/29]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Corporation
The Triad, Suite 200, 2200 Renaissance Boulevard
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
The Triad, Suite 200, 2200 Renaissance Boulevard
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200
Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
Law Department 140 Germantown Pike Suite 150
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US
Former [1993/35]For all designated states
HENKEL CORPORATION
300 Brookside Avenue
Ambler, Pennsylvania 19002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZEHLER, Eugene, R.
7449 Cinnamon Woods Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
02 / SCHNUR, Nicolas, E.
4347 Mount Alverno Road
Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US
[1993/35]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Former [1993/35]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date91906933.611.03.1991
[1993/35]
WO1991US01616
Priority number, dateUS1990055197912.07.1990         Original published format: US 551979
[1993/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9201030
Date:23.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0557279
Date:01.09.1993
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0557279
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:C10M105/38, C10M169/04, C09K5/04, // (C10M169/04, 105:38, 105:32), C10N40:30
[1993/35]
CPC:
C10M105/42 (EP,US); C10M105/38 (EP,KR,US); C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C10M171/008 (EP,US); C09K2205/24 (EP,US); C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/22 (EP,US); C10M2207/024 (EP,US); C10M2207/025 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US); C10M2207/027 (EP,US); C10M2207/123 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US); C10M2207/129 (EP,US); C10M2207/16 (EP,US);
C10M2207/22 (EP,US); C10M2207/281 (EP,US); C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US); C10M2207/284 (EP,US); C10M2207/285 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US); C10M2207/287 (EP,US); C10M2207/288 (EP,US);
C10M2207/40 (EP,US); C10M2207/404 (EP,US); C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2211/022 (EP,US); C10M2211/06 (EP,US); C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US); C10M2215/064 (EP,US); C10M2215/065 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US); C10M2215/086 (EP,US); C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US); C10M2215/224 (EP,US); C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US); C10M2215/26 (EP,US); C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US); C10M2217/028 (EP,US); C10M2217/042 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US); C10M2217/046 (EP,US); C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2219/02 (EP,US); C10M2219/022 (EP,US); C10M2219/024 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US); C10M2219/068 (EP,US); C10M2219/10 (EP,US);
C10M2219/102 (EP,US); C10M2219/104 (EP,US); C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2219/108 (EP,US); C10M2223/04 (EP,US); C10M2223/041 (EP,US);
C10M2223/042 (EP,US); C10M2223/045 (EP,US); C10M2223/047 (EP,US);
C10N2010/08 (EP,US); C10N2040/00 (EP,US); C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US); C10N2040/34 (EP,US); C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US); C10N2040/40 (EP,US); C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US); C10N2040/50 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/35]
TitleGerman:WÄRMETRÄGERFLÜSSIGKEITEN IN KÄLTEANLAGEN, WElCHE SCHMIERMITTEL ENTHALTEN[1996/29]
English:REFRIGERANT WORKING FLUIDS INCLUDING LUBRICANTS[1996/29]
French:FLUIDES DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR REFRIGERANTS CONTENANT UN LUBRIFIANT[1996/29]
Former [1993/35]SCHMIERMITTEL FÜR WÄRMETRÄGERFLÜSSIGKEITEN IN KÄLTEANLAGEN
Former [1993/35]LUBRICANT FOR REFRIGERANT HEAT TRANSFER FLUIDS
Former [1993/35]LUBRIFIANT POUR FLUIDES DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR REFRIGERANTS
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/29: Teilanmeldung 96100206.0 eingereicht am 09/01/96
EPB 1996/29: Divisional application 96100206.0 filed on 09/01/96
EPB 1996/29: Demande divisionnaire 96100206.0 déposée le 09/01/96
Entry into regional phase05.01.1993National basic fee paid 
05.01.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
05.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
30.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.1996Fee for grant paid
24.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP96100206.0  / EP0708173
EP96100207.8  / EP0711820
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.04.1997  05.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Opponent's representative
Geary, Stephen, et al, et al
Bawden & Associates
4 The Gatehouse
2 High Street
Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB
 02  12.04.1997  26.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
RWE- DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Ueberseering 40
D-22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schupfner, Gerhard D.
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/20]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.1997  05.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Opponent's representative
Geary, Stephen, et al, et al
Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street
Harpenden, Herts AL5 2TH / GB
 02  12.04.1997  26.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
RWE- DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Ueberseering 40
D-22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schupfner, Gerhard D.
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
Former [1999/23]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.1997  05.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Opponent's representative
Geary, Stephen, et al, et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
 02  12.04.1997  26.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
RWE- DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Ueberseering 40
D-22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schupfner, Gerhard D.
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
Former [1997/23]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.1997  05.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
Opponent's representative
Geary, Stephen
Uniqema Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 90 Wilton Middlesbrough
Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB
 02  12.04.1997  26.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
RWE- DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Ueberseering 40
D-22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schupfner, Gerhard D.
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
30.05.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.12.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.01.2000Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.05.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.03.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/22]
Appeal following opposition19.07.2000Appeal received No.  T0747/00
26.09.2000Statement of grounds filed
01.03.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
01.03.2005Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS2807155  [ ] (WILLIAMITIS VICTOR A);
 FR1212057  [ ] (ROHM & HAAS);
 US2961406  [ ] (MCNEIL JR HARRY D);
 FR1251029  [ ] (HEYDEN NEWPORT CHEMICAL CORP);
 DE1148683  [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH);
 FR1430111  [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 GB1028402  [ ] (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO);
 US4175045  [ ] (TIMONY PETER E [US]);
 US4851144  [ ] (MCGRAW PHILIP W [US], et al);
 EP0359071  [ ] (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]);
 WO9012849  [ ] (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]);
 EP0406479  [ ] (KYOSEKI SEIHIN GIJUTSU KENK [JP]);
 EP0430657  [ ] (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK [JP])
ExaminationEP0415778
 EP0435253
 EP0445611
 EP0448402
 EP0449406
 EP0452816
 EP0458584
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.