Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0521084

EP0521084 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RENDERING ANTI-ALIASED POLYGONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
2550 Garcia Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[1993/01]
Inventor(s)01 / WELLS, Stuart, C.
1033 Knickerbocker Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / VAN LOO, James
1864 Farndon Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
03 / WALLNER, Dawn, M.
6785 Rainbow Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
[1993/02]
Former [1993/01]01 / WELLS, Stuart, C.
1781 Columbus Place
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
02 / VAN LOO, James
1864 Farndon Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
03 / WALLNER, Dawn, M.
6785 Rainbow Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Wombwell, Francis
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date91906938.515.02.1991
[1993/01]
WO1991US01041
Priority number, dateUS1990049533819.03.1990         Original published format: US 495338
[1993/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9114995
Date:03.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0521084
Date:07.01.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1991
[1993/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0521084
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.10.1991
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/10, G09G1/16
[1999/17]
Former International [1993/01]G06F15/62, G06F15/72, G09G1/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1993/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT UM VERFÄLSCHTE POLYGONE DARZUSTELLEN[1993/01]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RENDERING ANTI-ALIASED POLYGONS[1993/01]
French:METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR REPRESENTER DES POLYGONES ANTICRENELES[1993/01]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1992National basic fee paid 
08.09.1992Search fee paid 
08.09.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB
08.09.1992Examination requested  [1993/01]
07.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0310176
 [X]  - COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. vol. 20, no. 11, November 1977, NEW YORK US pages 799 - 805 CROW 'THE ALIASING PROBLEM IN COMPUTER GENERATED SHADED IMAGES'
 [X]  - DIGEST OF PAPERS, SPRING COMPCON'82 22 February 1982, NEW-YORK pages 238 - 244 CROW 'COMPUTATIONAL ISSUES IN RENDERING ANTI-ALIASED DETAIL'
International search[AP]US4918626  ;
 [AP]US4908780  ;
 [A]US4704605  ;
 [A]US4780711  ;
 [A]US4873515