Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0482154

EP0482154 - DEVICE FOR CONVERTING A DIGITAL BLOCK AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.1994
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.1994 [1994/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASCOM TECH AG
Berner Technopark Morgenstrasse 129
CH-3018 Bern / CH
[1992/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MASSEY, James, Lee
Obere Waidstrasse 17
CH-8037 Zürich / CH
02 / LAI, Xuejia
Lerchenweg 31
CH-8303 Kloten / CH
[1992/18]
Representative(s)Schwerdtel, Eberhard
Ascom Tech AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Berner Technopark Morgenstrasse 129
3018 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [1992/18]Schwerdtel, Eberhard, Dr.
Ascom Tech AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Berner Technopark Morgenstrasse 129
CH-3018 Bern / CH
Application number, filing date91908542.316.05.1991
[1992/18]
WO1991CH00117
Priority number, dateCH1990000169018.05.1990         Original published format: CH 169090
[1992/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9118459
Date:28.11.1991
[1991/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0482154
Date:29.04.1992
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991
[1992/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0482154
Date:30.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/06
[1992/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/18]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS UMWANDELN EINES DIGITALBLOCKES UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN[1992/18]
English:DEVICE FOR CONVERTING A DIGITAL BLOCK AND THE USE THEREOF[1992/18]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE BLOCS NUMERIQUES ET SON UTILISATION[1992/18]
Entry into regional phase14.01.1992National basic fee paid 
14.01.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1992Examination requested  [1992/18]
17.08.1992Request for accelerated examination filed
08.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.1992Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.12.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.1993Fee for grant paid
19.03.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0221538
 [A]US4255811