Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0528919

EP0528919 - TERMINATION OF ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.1995
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.08.1995 [1995/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/09]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GIBLER, Carma, Joleen
410 Southchester Lane
Houston, TX 77079 / US
02 / CHAMBERLAIN, Linda, Rae
2010 Thompson Crossing
Richmond, TX 77469 / US
03 / BROWNSCOMBE, Thomas, Fairchild
2737 Amherst
Houston, TX 77005 / US
04 / STEVENS, Craig, Aldred
19515 Mills Meadow Lane
Houston, TX 77094 / US
[1993/09]
Application number, filing date91909479.713.05.1991
[1993/09]
WO1991EP00899
Priority number, dateUS1990052269314.05.1990         Original published format: US 522693
US1991068511115.04.1991         Original published format: US 685111
[1993/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9118025
Date:28.11.1991
[1991/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0528919
Date:03.03.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991
[1993/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528919
Date:31.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.01.1992
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/42, C08C19/44
[1993/09]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/35]
Former [1993/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:BEENDIGUNG VON ANIONISCHER POLYMERISATION[1994/35]
English:TERMINATION OF ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION[1993/09]
French:TERMINAISON DE POLYMERISATION ANIONIQUE[1993/09]
Former [1993/09]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROLYSE MIT EINER PORÖSEN ELEKTRODE
Entry into regional phase15.09.1992National basic fee paid 
15.09.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.1991Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
15.09.1992Examination requested  [1993/09]
14.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.1994Fee for grant paid
04.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]JP1217011  ;
 [X]GB2118952  ;
 [X]GB1243702  ;
 [X]GB1539905  ;
 [X]US4284741  ;
 [X]FR2536752  ;
 [A]US3644567  ;
 [A]GB1162780
 [X]  - Database Chemical Abstracts (HOST:STN) AN: CA112(8): 58054t (Columbus, Ohio, US), & JP, A, 1217011 (SUMITOMO) 30 August 1989, see the whole abstract, & JP1217011 A 19890830