Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0481061

EP0481061 - MULTICOLOR IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND TRANSFER ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.1993
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.1993Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.11.1993 [1993/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Kevin, Michael
260 Berkeley Street
Rochester, NY 14607 / US
02 / ZEMAN, Robert, Edward
1243 Hardwood Lane
Webster, NY 14580 / US
[1992/17]
Representative(s)Blickle, K. Werner , et al
KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung
D-70323 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]Blickle, K. Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
KODAK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung
D-70323 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date91909749.301.05.1991
[1992/17]
WO1991US03001
Priority number, dateUS1990051999907.05.1990         Original published format: US 519999
[1992/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9117487
Date:14.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0481061
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991
[1992/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/16, G03G15/01
[1992/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1992/17]
TitleGerman:MEHRFARBENBILDERZEUGUNGSGERÄT UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSWALZE[1992/17]
English:MULTICOLOR IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND TRANSFER ROLLER[1992/17]
French:APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES MULTICOLORES ET ROULEAUX DE TRANSFERT[1992/17]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Entry into regional phase13.12.1991National basic fee paid 
13.12.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.1992Examination requested  [1992/25]
24.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.1993Application withdrawn by applicant  [1993/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4605298  ;
 [A]JPS6015663  ;
 [A]JPS6015662  ;
 [A]JPS6199170
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol 11, no. 68 (P-553)[2515]28 February 1987,
 [A]  - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 308, December 1989, (New York, US), "Rotary receiver sheet gripper for roller transfer apparatus", page 973see the whole disclosure
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 133 (P-362)[1856], 8 June 1985& JP-A-60 15 663 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 26 January 1985
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 133 (P-362)[1856], 8 June 1985& JP-A-60 15 662 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 26 January 1985
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 278 (P-499)[2334], 20 September 1986, & JP-A-61 99 170 (RICOH CO.LTD) 17 May 1986