Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0509062 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0509062



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 980
14.11.2003 Refund of fees Appeal 1
14.11.2003 Refund of fees Appeal 1
08.08.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.08.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.08.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
05.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
05.08.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
02.08.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
18.07.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 2
18.07.2003 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
18.07.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.07.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
18.07.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
17.04.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.04.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.04.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
17.04.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.04.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
10.04.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
10.04.2003 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Opposition 1
04.04.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.04.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.04.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.03.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
27.12.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.12.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.12.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.12.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.12.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 23
17.12.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 31
17.12.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 31
17.12.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
13.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 3
26.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.10.2002 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
22.10.2002 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
22.10.2002 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
21.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.10.2002 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
05.09.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
02.09.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.08.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.08.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.08.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.08.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
20.08.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.08.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.08.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
03.06.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.05.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.05.1998 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.05.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
22.05.1998 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.05.1998 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.01.1998 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
22.01.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.01.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.01.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.01.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.01.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
12.01.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
28.11.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.11.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.11.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.11.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.11.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.11.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.11.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.11.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.11.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.11.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.09.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.09.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.09.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.09.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.09.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 10
11.09.1997 Claims Opposition 4
11.09.1997 Claims Opposition 2
11.09.1997 Claims Opposition 5
11.09.1997 Description Opposition 4
11.09.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Drawings Opposition 3
11.09.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
11.09.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
11.09.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.1997 Text intended for grant Opposition 20
30.06.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
06.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
17.04.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
17.04.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.10.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.10.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.10.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.09.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.09.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.08.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
26.08.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
26.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.05.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.01.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
19.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
10.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 5
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 5
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Claims Opposition 4
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 8
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 8
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Description Opposition 3
18.09.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
12.07.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.07.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.12.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
22.12.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
22.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
22.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.12.1994 Non-scannable object Opposition 9
16.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
16.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
16.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.12.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.02.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.11.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.11.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.11.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.09.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
10.09.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.05.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
24.05.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
10.05.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.04.1993 Claims Search / examination 5
20.04.1993 Description Search / examination 2
20.04.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.03.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.09.1992 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.08.1992 General enquiry Search / examination 1
27.08.1992 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.05.1992 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.01.1992 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.01.1992 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.01.1992 Translation of priority document Search / examination 11
27.12.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
27.12.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.11.1991 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
28.11.1991 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 40
28.11.1991 Priority document Search / examination 16
27.09.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.09.1991 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
19.06.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1