Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0484502

EP0484502 - METHOD FOR STRUCTURAL ATTACHMENT OF POLYCARBONATE PLASTIC SHEET TO SUPPORTING STRENGTH MEMBERS AND ASSEMBLY UTILIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/20]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STRUCTURAL ATTACHEMENT OF POLYCARBONATE PLASTIC SHEET TO SUPPORTING STRENGTH MEMBERS AND AIR CARGO CONTAINER UTILIZING SAME
[1994/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.1995
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.11.1995 [1995/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Looker, Robert
405 Toro Canyon Road Carpenteria
California 93013 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/20]For all designated states
Looker, Robert
405 Toro Canyon Road
Carpenteria California 93013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1992/20]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/10]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1992/20]Williams, Trevor John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date91910458.821.05.1991
[1992/20]
WO1991US03577
Priority number, dateUS1990052704222.05.1990         Original published format: US 527042
[1992/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9117934
Date:28.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0484502
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991
[1992/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0484502
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.11.1991
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:B65D88/00, B65D25/00, B65D8/04
[1992/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BELASTBAREN VERBINDUNG VON POLYCARBONAT-KUNSTSTOFFSCHICHTEN MIT TRAGENDEN ELEMENTEN UND AUFBAU BEI DEM DAS VERFAHREN ANWENDUNG FINDET[1994/48]
English:METHOD FOR STRUCTURAL ATTACHMENT OF POLYCARBONATE PLASTIC SHEET TO SUPPORTING STRENGTH MEMBERS AND ASSEMBLY UTILIZING SAME[1994/48]
French:PROCEDE DE FIXATION STRUCTURELLE DE PLAQUES DE PLASTIQUE POLYCARBONATE A DES ELEMENTS DE RESISTANCE ET ASSEMBLAGE UTILISANT LEDIT PROCEDE[1994/48]
Former [1992/20]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BELASTBAREN VERBINDUNG VON POLYCARBONAT-KUNSTSTOFFSCHICHTEN MIT TRAGENDEN ELEMENTEN UND LUFTFRACHTBEHÄLTER WOBEI DAS VERFAHREN ANWENDUNG FINDET
Former [1992/20]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STRUCTURAL ATTACHEMENT OF POLYCARBONATE PLASTIC SHEET TO SUPPORTING STRENGTH MEMBERS AND AIR CARGO CONTAINER UTILIZING SAME
Former [1992/20]PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FIXATION STRUCTURELLE DE PLAQUES DE PLASTIQUE POLYCARBONATE A DES ELEMENTS DE RESISTANCE ET CONTENEURS POUR FRET AERIEN UTILISANT LEDIT PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase06.12.1991National basic fee paid 
06.12.1991Search fee paid 
06.12.1991Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.1991Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/20]
08.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.1994Fee for grant paid
15.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4833771  ;
 [Y]DE8704815U  ;
 [Y]DE2927587  ;
 [Y]US4158938
International search[Y]US3677433  ;
 [Y]FR53945  ;
 [A]US2141861  ;
 [A]US3955702  ;
 [A]GB275863  ;
 [A]FR1345101  ;
 [A]US4497525