Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0600865

EP0600865 - XYLANASE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Quest International Services B.V.
Huizerstraatweg 28
1411 GP Naarden / NL
[2004/17]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V.
Huizerstraatweg 28
1411 GP Naarden / NL
Former [1994/24]For all designated states
QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V.
Huizerstraatweg 28
NL-1411 GP Naarden / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN GORCOM, Robert, F., M.
Liberiastraat 7
NL-2622 DE Delft / NL
02 / HESSING, Johanna, G., M.
A. van Scheltemaplein 38
NL-2624 PG Delft / NL
03 / MAAT, Jan
Molenstraat 2
NL-2681 BS Monster / NL
04 / ROZA, Martinus
Ooievaarstraat 9
NL-3291 XL Strijen / NL
05 / VERBAKEL, Johannes, Maria, A.
Ingeland 9
NL-3155 GC Maasland / NL
[1994/24]
Representative(s)Duffy, Assumpta Dympna , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Duffy, Assumpta Dympna , et al
FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2005/11]Duffy, Assumpta Dympna , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2004/44]Boyce, Conor , et al
F.R. Kelly & Co, 27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge, Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [1994/24]de Bruijn, Leendert C. , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date91910872.018.06.1991
[1994/24]
WO1991EP01135
Priority number, dateNL1990000138819.06.1990         Original published format: NL 9001388
[1994/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9119782
Date:26.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0600865
Date:15.06.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.1991
[1994/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0600865
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0600865
Date:04.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.12.1991
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/15, C12N1/21, C12N1/19, C12N5/10, C12N15/56, C12N9/24, A21D8/04
[1994/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/24]
TitleGerman:XYLANASEPRODUKTION[1994/24]
English:XYLANASE PRODUCTION[1994/24]
French:PRODUCTION DE XYLANASE[1994/24]
Entry into regional phase14.12.1992National basic fee paid 
14.12.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
14.12.1992Examination requested  [1994/24]
02.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.1997Observations by third parties
18.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.01.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2000Fee for grant paid
04.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001  26.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Lesaffre International
137 rue Gabriel Péri
59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR
Opponent's representative
Gallois, Valérie
Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
 02  20.06.2001  05.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 03  20.06.2001  22.09.2003  WITHDRAWN
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM Intellectual Property
Office Delft PP600-0240
P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2005/47]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001  26.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Lesaffre International
137 rue Gabriel Péri
59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR
Opponent's representative
Gallois, Valérie
Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
 02  20.06.2001  05.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001  22.09.2003  WITHDRAWN
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks Department Office Delft (600-0240) P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [2005/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001  26.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Lesaffre International
137 rue Gabriel Péri
59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR
 02  20.06.2001  05.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001  22.09.2003  WITHDRAWN
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks Department Office Delft (600-0240) P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [2003/50]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001  26.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Lesaffre International
137 rue Gabriel Péri
59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR
Opponent's representative
De Vleeschauwer, Natalie
Lesaffre International 147, rue Gabriel Péri B.P. 6027
59706 Marcq-en-Baroeul Cedex / FR
 02  20.06.2001  05.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001  22.09.2003  WITHDRAWN
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks Department Office Delft (600-0240) P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [2001/40]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001  26.07.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Lesaffre International
137 rue Gabriel Péri
59700 Marcq-en-Baroeul / FR
Opponent's representative
De Vleeschauwer, Natalie
Lesaffre International 147, rue Gabriel Péri B.P. 6027
59706 Marcq-en-Baroeul Cedex / FR
 02  20.06.2001   
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001   
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks, Office Delft, (994-0760), Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [2001/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001   
G.I.E. LESAFFRE DEVELOPPEMENT
147, rue Gabriel Péri
F-59706 MARCQ-EN-BAROEUL / FR
Opponent's representative
De Vleeschauwer, Natalie
Lesaffre Développement 147, rue Gabriel Péri B.p. 6027
59706 Marcq-en-Baroeul Cedex / FR
 02  20.06.2001   
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001   
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks, Office Delft, (994-0760), Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [2001/33]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2001   
G.I.E. LESAFFRE DEVELOPPEMENT
147, rue Gabriel Péri
F-59706 MARCQ-EN-BAROEUL / FR
Opponent's representative
De Vleeschauwer, Natalie
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussel / BE
 02  20.06.2001   
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
925 Page Mill Rd.
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US
Opponent's representative
Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
 03  20.06.2001   
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Heuvel, Margaretha
DSM N.V. Patents and Trademarks, Office Delft, (994-0760), Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
11.09.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03)
23.10.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.05.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.03.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.08.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.10.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.07.2005Appeal received No.  T0911/05
16.03.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Request for further processing for:06.04.1999Request for further processing filed
06.04.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.04.1999Decision despatched
14.02.1997Request for further processing filed
14.02.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
07.03.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
20.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2000
CH20.09.2000
LI20.09.2000
[2002/02]
Former [2001/37]AT20.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0316023
 [Y]GB2091268
 [Y]FR2555602
 [X]  CURRENT GENETICS, vol. 12, no. 6, 1987, M.E. PENTTILA et al.: "Construction of brewer's yeasts secreting fungal endo-beta-glucanase", pages 413-420, see the whole article
 [Y]  BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 27, no. 4, 1985, R. FOURNIER et al.: "Purification and characterization of endo-xylanases from aspergillus niger. III. An enzyme of pl 3.65", pages 539-546, see the whole article (cited in the application)
 [A]  JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, vol. 53, no. 3, 1988, M.C. K]HN et al.: "Influence of the enzymatic modification of the nonstarchy polysaccharide fractions on the baking properties of reconstituted rye flour", pages 889-895, see the whole article