Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0495940

EP0495940 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING PUSHED-IN DRAWERS IN THE BODY OF AN ITEM OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.04.1996 [1996/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PAUL HETTICH GMBH & CO.
Postfach 1240
D-32269 Kirchlengern / DE
[1992/31]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHRÖDER, Gerhard
Worthgarten 2
D-4970 Bad Oeynhausen 9 / DE
02 / FAUST, Karl-Volker
Steinbockstr. 15
D-4800 Bielefeld 15 / DE
03 / NOSKE, Frank
Kutenhauser Str. 86
D-4950 Minden / DE
[1992/31]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/31]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82
D-33518 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date91912556.712.07.1991
[1992/31]
WO1991DE00581
Priority number, dateDE19900013161U17.09.1990         Original published format: DE 9013161 U
[1992/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9204843
Date:02.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0495940
Date:29.07.1992
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992
[1992/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0495940
Date:03.05.1995
Language:DE
[1995/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.1992
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/04
[1992/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/03]
Former [1992/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN EINES IN EINEN MÖBELKORPUS EINGESCHOBENEN SCHUBKASTENS[1992/31]
English:DEVICE FOR HOLDING PUSHED-IN DRAWERS IN THE BODY OF AN ITEM OF FURNITURE[1992/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN D'UN TIROIR INSERE DANS LE CORPS D'UN MEUBLE[1992/31]
Entry into regional phase03.03.1992National basic fee paid 
03.03.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.1992Examination requested  [1992/31]
21.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.1995Fee for grant paid
14.01.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[P]EP0391221  (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]);
 [A]DE1262533  (OSKAR MERZ MEYER);
 [A]DE8907511U