Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0557284

EP0557284 - COMPUTER WITH SEPARATE DISPLAY PLANE AND USER INTERFACE PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.1996
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.09.1996 [1996/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WANG LABORATORIES INC.
One Industrial Avenue
Lowell, MA 01851 / US
[1993/35]
Inventor(s)01 / BARRETT, David, M.
45 Beverlee Road
Tyngsboro, MA 01879 / US
02 / MCNALLY, J., Michael
14 Nut Meadow Lane
Derry, NH 03038 / US
03 / MARTIN, Patricia, A.
120 Hayden Road
Groton, MA 01450 / US
04 / HUNTINGTON, Jonathan, T., II
11 Winter Street
Salem, MA 01970 / US
05 / DOUTHART, Robert, M.
116 Rattlesnake Hill Road
Auburn, NH 03032 / US
[1993/35]
Representative(s)Behrens, Dieter , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date91913749.720.06.1991
[1993/35]
WO1991US04462
Priority number, dateUS1990061332513.11.1990         Original published format: US 613325
[1993/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9209038
Date:29.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0557284
Date:01.09.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0557284
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/02, G06F3/033
[1993/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1993/35]
TitleGerman:RECHNER MIT GETRENNTER ANZEIGEEBENE UND BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENRECHNER[1993/35]
English:COMPUTER WITH SEPARATE DISPLAY PLANE AND USER INTERFACE PROCESSOR[1993/35]
French:ORDINATEUR COMPRENANT UN ECRAN DE VISUALISATION SEPARE ET UN PROCESSEUR D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR[1993/35]
Entry into regional phase10.05.1993National basic fee paid 
10.05.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
10.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
13.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.03.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.1995Fee for grant paid
27.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.06.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0395469  (TELEMATIQUE VIDEOTEX FRANCAISE [FR])
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 28, no. 6, November 1985, NEW YORK US pages 2721 - 2724; 'graphic bit-blt copy under mask' see page 2724, line 2 - line 28; figure 3