Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0545958

EP0545958 - A PROCESS FOR HYDROLYZING HEMICELLULOSE BY ENZYMES PRODUCED BY TRICHODERMA REESEI [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS
c/o VTT Technology Oy, PL 402
02151 Espoo / FI
[2003/31]
Former [1993/24]For all designated states
VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS
c/o VTT Technology Oy, PL 402
SF-02151 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KANTELINEN, Anne
Mateorinrata 5 C
SF-02210 Espoo / FI
02 / PERE, Jaakko
Laajaniityntie 8 D 54
SF-01620 Vantaa / FI
03 / POUTANEN, Kaisa
Lielahdentie 7 a B 19
SF-00200 Helsinki / FI
04 / TENKANEN, Maija
Kaskilaaksontie 3 C 69
SF-02360 Espoo / FI
05 / VIIKARI, Liisa
Lookkikuja 5 F
SF-00200 Helsinki / FI
[1993/24]
Representative(s)Knuth-Lehtola, Sisko Hillevi , et al
Seppo Laine Oy P.O.B. 339
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Knuth-Lehtola, Sisko Hillevi , et al
Seppo Laine Oy P. O. Box 183
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [1996/10]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1993/24]Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey , et al
J.A.KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date91914361.027.08.1991
[1993/24]
WO1991FI00265
Priority number, dateFI1990000421427.08.1990         Original published format: FI 904214
[1993/24]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9203541
Date:05.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0545958
Date:16.06.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992
[1993/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0545958
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0545958
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/42, D21C9/10, // C12S3/08
[1993/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/24]
TitleGerman:EIN PROZESS ZUR HEMIZELLULOSE MIT ENZYMEN, DIE DURCH TRICHODERMA REESEI PRODUZIERT WERDEN, ZU HYDROLYSIEREN[1993/24]
English:A PROCESS FOR HYDROLYZING HEMICELLULOSE BY ENZYMES PRODUCED BY TRICHODERMA REESEI[1993/24]
French:PROCEDE D'HYDROLYSE DE L'HEMICELLULOSE A L'AIDE D'ENZYMES PRODUITES PAR TRICHODERMA REESEI[1993/24]
Entry into regional phase03.03.1992Translation filed 
26.02.1993National basic fee paid 
26.02.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
26.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/24]
16.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.1996Fee for grant paid
28.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.04.1997  22.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
DSM Gist Holding B.V.
Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Klein, Bart
Gist-Brocades
Patents & Trademarks Department
Postbus 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2000/18]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.1997  22.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
DSM Gist B.V.
Wateringseweg 1, PO-box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Klein, Bart
Gist-Brocades, Patents Trademarks Department, Wateringseweg 1, P.O. Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [1997/28]
Opponent(s)01  29.04.1997  22.05.1997  ADMISSIBLE
GIST- BROCADES B.V.
Wateringseweg 1, PO-box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Klein, Bart
Gist-Brocades, Patents & Trademarks Department Postbus 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
04.06.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.09.1999Date of oral proceedings
24.11.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.11.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.02.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.05.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition27.01.2000Appeal received No.  T0222/00
03.04.2000Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
09.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.07.1996
CH31.07.1996
FR31.07.1996
LI31.07.1996
NL31.07.1996
LU31.08.1996
[2006/32]
Former [2004/22]AT31.07.1996
CH31.07.1996
LI31.07.1996
NL31.07.1996
LU31.08.1996
Former [2004/14]AT31.07.1996
NL31.07.1996
LU31.08.1996
Former [2004/13]NL31.07.1996
LU31.08.1996
Former [2000/06]LU31.08.1996
Cited inInternational search[A]US4797361  (MONTENECOURT BLAND S [US])
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 105, No. 23, 8 December 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), LAPPALAINEN, ARJA: "Purification and characterization of xylanolytic enzymes from Trichoderma reesei", see page 265, Abstract 205246t, & Biotechnol. Appl. Biochem. 1986, 8(5), 437-448.
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 107, No. 15, 12 October 1987, (Columbus, Ohio, US), POUTANEN, KAISA et al.: "Evaluation of different microbial xylanolytic systems", see page 581, Abstract 132597n, & J. Biotechnol. 1987, 6(1), 49-60.
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 109, No. 5, 1 August 1988, (Columbus, Ohio, US), BIELY, PETER et al.: "Resolution of glycanases of Trichoderma reesei with respect to cellulose and xylan degradation", see page 280, Abstract 34278f, & Biotechnol.Appl.Biochem. 1988, 10(2), 99-106.
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 100, No. 11, 12 March 1984, (Columbus, Ohio, US), ESTERBAUER, HERMAN et al.: "Enzymic degradation of hemicelluloses by Trichoderma reesei enzymes", see page 424, Abstract 84137u, & Papier (Darmstadt) 1983, 37(12), 601-608.
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 111, No. 17, 23 October 1989, (Columbus, Ohio, US), POUTANEN, KAISA et al.: "The xylanolytic enzyme system of Trichoderma reesei", see page 313, Abstract 149377w, & ACS Symp.Ser. 1989, 399(), 630-640.
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 105, No. 1, 7 July 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), HRMOVA, MARIA et al.: "Specificity of cellulase and beta-xylanase induction in Trichoderma reesei", see page 317, Abstract 3269s, & Arch.Microbiol. 1986, 144(3), 307-311.
Opposition   - Poutanen, K. (1988), Dissertation, Espoo 1988, Technical Research Centre of Finland, Publications 47
    - Biely & Markovic, Biotechnol. Appl. Biochem.10 (1988) 107-117