Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0545958 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0545958



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 655
23.12.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.06.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
30.05.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
23.05.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.02.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
27.02.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
27.02.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
19.02.2003 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Opposition 1
10.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 11
22.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
22.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
21.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
20.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
20.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2003 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 10
13.01.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2003 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.01.2003 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
07.01.2003 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.10.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
25.10.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
22.10.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.10.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.10.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
14.10.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.10.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.10.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
01.10.2002 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.10.2002 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.11.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
26.10.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.08.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
25.08.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.08.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
12.05.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.04.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.04.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.04.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.04.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.04.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
03.04.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
22.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
22.03.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
22.03.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
10.03.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 21
10.03.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.03.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.02.2000 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
27.01.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.01.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
24.11.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 3
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 3
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Claims Opposition 2
24.11.1999 Description Opposition 3
24.11.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
24.11.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.11.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 8
25.09.1999 Claims Opposition 3
25.09.1999 Claims Opposition 2
25.09.1999 Claims Opposition 3
25.09.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.1999 General authorisation Opposition 1
20.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 6
17.09.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
07.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.08.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.08.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.07.1999 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.1999 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.1999 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.1999 Claims Opposition 2
24.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
02.03.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
01.02.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.01.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.01.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
22.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
22.01.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
11.01.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.12.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.1998 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
06.03.1998 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
02.03.1998 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
24.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.02.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.02.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.02.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
13.02.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
28.01.1998 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
22.01.1998 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
16.01.1998 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
16.01.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.12.1997 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
16.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.12.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.06.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.05.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.04.1997 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.04.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.04.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.04.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
20.06.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.03.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.03.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.03.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.01.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.01.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
04.01.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.12.1995 Claims Search / examination 1
19.12.1995 Description Search / examination 3
19.12.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.08.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.08.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
26.07.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.06.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
16.06.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.02.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.08.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.1993 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.03.1993 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.03.1993 Translation of priority document Search / examination 10
26.02.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.02.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
24.02.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
24.02.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
24.02.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.12.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
02.12.1992 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
10.04.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.03.1992 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.03.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
05.03.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
05.03.1992 Priority document Search / examination 10
19.09.1991 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.08.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8