blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0551327

EP0551327 - LONGITUDINAL COMPRESSIVE TREATMENT OF WEB MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.1999 [1999/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WALTON, Richard C.
c/o The Walton Group, 20 North Main Street, Suite 250
Sherborn, MA 01770 / US
[1994/23]
Former [1993/29]For all designated states
Walton, Richard R.
10 West Hill Place
Boston Massachusetts 02114 / US
For all designated states
WALTON, Richard C.
c/o The Walton Group, 20 North Main Street, Suite 250
Sherborn, MA 01770 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALTON, Richard, R.
DECEASED
NOT RELEVANT / US
02 / WALTON, Richard C., c/o The Walton Group
20 North Main Street, Suite 250
Sherborn, MA 01770 / US
03 / MUNCHBACH, George, E.
26 June Street
Roslindale, MA 02131 / US
[1994/23]
Former [1993/37]01 / WALTON, Richard, R.
10 West Hill Place
Boston, MA 02114 / US
02 / WALTON, Richard C., c/o The Walton Group
20 North Main Street, Suite 250
Sherborn, MA 01770 / US
03 / MUNCHBACH, George, E.
26 June Street
Roslindale, MA 02131 / US
Former [1993/29]01 / WALTON, Richard, R.
10 West Hill Place
Boston, MA 02114 / US
02 / WALTON, Richard, C.
55 Seaver Street
Wellesley Hills, MA 02181 / US
03 / MUNCHBACH, George, E.
26 June Street
Roslindale, MA 02131 / US
Representative(s)Deans, Michael John Percy, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/29]Deans, Michael John Percy, et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date91917140.524.09.1991
[1993/29]
WO1991US06945
Priority number, dateUS1990058701724.09.1990         Original published format: US 587017
[1993/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9205306
Date:02.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0551327
Date:21.07.1993
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1993/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0551327
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.04.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1993
ClassificationIPC:D06C21/00
[1993/29]
CPC:
D06C21/00 (EP,US); D06B23/026 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1993/29]
TitleGerman:LONGITUDINALE PRESSBEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBEMATERIAL[1993/29]
English:LONGITUDINAL COMPRESSIVE TREATMENT OF WEB MATERIALS[1993/29]
French:TRAITEMENT DE COMPRESSION LONGITUDINALE DE MATERIAUX EN BANDE[1993/29]
Entry into regional phase22.03.1993National basic fee paid 
22.03.1993Search fee paid 
22.03.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
22.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/29]
11.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.1998Fee for grant paid
18.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97118043.5  / EP0829566
Opposition(s)18.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0364788  (WALTON RICHARD R [US]);
 [A]WO8706632  (CATALLO FRANK [US])
International search[Y]US4142278  (WALTON RICHARD R, et al);
 [Y]US4796880  (TAMARY ERNEST J [US]);
 [A]US1690411  (WILLIAM HUDSON DAVID);
 [A]US1751471  (CAMPBELL SAMUEL J);
 [A]US2851206  (HERMANN GUENTHER, et al);
 [A]US4882819  (MILLIGAN WILLIAM D [US], et al);
 [A]DE1955195  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE);
 [A]US4698052  (SLOBODKIN YEFIM [US]);
 [A]US3089415  (GREMBECKI ELMER C, et al);
 [A]US2958608  (BARNARD KENNETH H);
 [A]US4899863  (SETTLES DAVID J [US]);
 [A]US4627137  (WILDT EBERHARD [DE]);
 [A]US4291438  (SEIKI KAZUO, et al);
 [A]US3810280  (MUNCHBACH G, et al);
 [A]US3975806  (WALTON RICHARD RHODES, et al);
 [A]US3981085  (FRANKO EUGENE B);
 [A]US3992000  (MARTIN HARVEY G);
 [A]US3260778  (WALTON RICHARD R);
 [A]US3353222  (KEEL ALVIN M, et al);
 [A]US4052150  (BEHUN EUGENE);
 [A]US4041581  (DIGGLE JR EDMUND A);
 [A]US3447221  (ODIORNE JOHN W);
 [A]US3426405  (WALTON RICHARD RHODES);
 [A]US3320891  (HOLMES DONALD E);
 [A]US2309585  (HADDOCK DANIEL T)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.