blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0582569

EP0582569 - ELASTICIZED FABRIC WITH CONTINUOUS FILAMENTS AND METHOD OF FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.1999
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.1999 [1999/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sabee, Reinhardt Nils
728 South Summit Street Appleton
Wisconsin 54911 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/07]For all designated states
Sabee, Reinhardt Nils
728 South Summit Street
Appleton Wisconsin 54911 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/07]
Representative(s)Adams, William Gordon, et al
RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon
Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/07]Adams, William Gordon, et al
RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road
Croydon Surrey CR0 2EF / GB
Application number, filing date91917151.224.09.1991
[1994/07]
WO1991US06925
Priority number, dateUS1991067254120.03.1991         Original published format: US 672541
[1994/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9216366
Date:01.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0582569
Date:16.02.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0582569
Date:17.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1994
ClassificationIPC:B32B5/26, D04H5/00, D04H13/00
[1994/07]
CPC:
B32B5/26 (EP); D04H1/559 (EP); D04H1/56 (EP);
D04H3/02 (EP); D04H3/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1994/07]
TitleGerman:ELASTISCHES GEWEBE MIT ENDLOSFÄDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[1998/25]
English:ELASTICIZED FABRIC WITH CONTINUOUS FILAMENTS AND METHOD OF FORMING[1994/07]
French:TISSU ELASTIFIE A FILAMENTS CONTINUS ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1994/07]
Former [1994/07]ELASTICHES GEWEBE MIT ENDLOSFÄDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG
Entry into regional phase25.09.1993National basic fee paid 
25.09.1993Search fee paid 
25.09.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
25.09.1993Examination requested  [1994/07]
22.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.1998Fee for grant paid
07.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9003464  (KIMBERLY-CLARK) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-7,11,12;
 [YA]US4801482  (GARY L. GOGGANS) [Y] 1 * column W * [A] 2-12;
 [A]US4863779  (DIEGO H. DAPONTE) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]US4652487  (MICHAEL T.NORMAN) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-12 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3734963  (KIMBERLY -CLARK) [A] 1,2,4,5,9-12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0239080  (KIMBERLY-CLARK) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-9,12 * claim - *
International search[Y]US4209563  ;
 [Y]US3912567  ;
 [Y]US3949130  ;
 [Y]US4013816  ;
 [Y]US4657802  ;
 [Y]US4605458  ;
 [Y]US4606964  ;
 [Y]US4692368  ;
 [Y]US4720415
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.