Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0553217

EP0553217 - SOFTENING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRECISION PROCESSES TEXTILES
Dylan Laboratories Ambergate
Derby DE5 2EY / GB
[1993/31]
Inventor(s)01 / CONNELL, David, Longley Ithersey
Burland Green Lane Western Underwood
Derby DE6 4PF / GB
02 / HUDDLESTONE, Kenneth, Michael 195 Allestree Lane
Allestree
Derby DE3 2PF / GB
03 / BAMFORD, Susan
53 West Avenue Ripley
Derbyshire DE5 3JA / GB
[1993/31]
Representative(s)Gaunt, Robert John
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/31]Gaunt, Robert John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street
London EC4Y 1LL / GB
Application number, filing date91919216.115.10.1991
[1993/31]
WO1991GB01792
Priority number, dateGB1990002230515.10.1990         Original published format: GB 9022305
[1993/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9207132
Date:30.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0553217
Date:04.08.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1992
[1993/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0553217
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.1992
ClassificationInternational:D06M15/53, D06M13/372, D06M15/61
[1993/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/31]
TitleGerman:WEICHMACHER[1993/31]
English:SOFTENING AGENTS[1993/31]
French:AGENTS ASSOUPLISSANTS[1993/31]
Entry into regional phase23.02.1993National basic fee paid 
23.02.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
23.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/31]
19.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
13.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1999Fee for grant paid
13.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XP]EP0414377  ;
 [X]DE1419042  ;
 [X]FR1165287  ;
 [A]US3038820  ;
 [A]GB1171304