Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0548286

EP0548286 - SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A VIDEO RECORDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/26]USER INTERFACE FOR TELEVISION SCHEDULE SYSTEM
[1998/29]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2008  [2008/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starsight Telecast, Inc.
39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/48]For all designated states
STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC.
39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
Former [1993/26]For all designated states
INSIGHT TELECAST, INC.
39650 Liberty Street, Third Floor
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YOUNG, Patrick
1496 Cherrywood Drive
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
02 / ROOP, John, H.
3511 Cowper Street
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
03 / EBRIGHT, Allan, R.
16121 Wood Acres Road
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
04 / FABER, Michael, W.
833 Abbie Street
Pleasonton, CA 94566 / US
05 / ANDERSON, David
534 Bush Street
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
[1993/26]
Representative(s)Kinsler, Maureen Catherine , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Kinsler, Maureen Catherine , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1998/08]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Former [1993/26]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date91919325.010.09.1991
[1993/26]
WO1991US06367
Priority number, dateUS1990057955510.09.1990         Original published format: US 579555
[1993/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9204801
Date:19.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0548286
Date:30.06.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992
[1993/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0548286
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/76
[1993/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES VIDEOAUFNAHMEGERÄTS[1998/29]
English:SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A VIDEO RECORDING MACHINE[1998/29]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR CONTROLER UN MAGNETOSCOPE[1998/29]
Former [1993/26]ANWENDERENDGERÄT FÜR FERNSEH-PROGRAMMTAFEL-SYSTEM
Former [1993/26]USER INTERFACE FOR TELEVISION SCHEDULE SYSTEM
Former [1993/26]INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR SYSTEME DE PROGRAMMATION DE TELEVISION
Entry into regional phase16.03.1993National basic fee paid 
16.03.1993Search fee paid 
16.03.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
16.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/26]
22.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
26.04.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
30.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1999Fee for grant paid
25.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00204781.9  / EP1111912
EP02077533.4  / EP1244300
EP03076604.2  / EP1337108
EP03076605.9  / EP1377049
EP05076431.5  / EP1585321
EP05076852.2  / EP1608158
EP05077892.7  / EP1653732
EP99202116.2  / EP0969662
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2000  02.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Herbert Smith
Exchange House Primrose Street
London EC2A 2HS / GB
 02  05.01.2001  02.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Pace Micro Technology Plc
Victoria Road Saltaire
Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB
Opponent's representative
Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2001/10]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2000   
Herbert Smith
Exchange House Primrose Street
London EC2A 2HS / GB
 02  05.01.2001   
Pace Micro Technology Plc
Victoria Road Saltaire
Shipley BD18 3 LF / GB
Opponent's representative
Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD / GB
Former [2001/08]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2000   
Herbert Smith
Exchange House Primrose Street
London EC2A 2HS / GB
07.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.08.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.07.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
01.08.2003Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/01]
Request for further processing for:30.06.1999Request for further processing filed
30.06.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.1999Decision despatched
17.07.1997Request for further processing filed
17.07.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
04.08.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR05.04.2000
[2008/24]
Documents cited:Search[YA]GB2155713  (RCA CORP) [Y] 3,4 * page 1, line 75 - line 104 * * page 3, line 20 - line 46; figure 1A * * page 3, line 124 - page 4, line 8 * [A] 5;
 [A]WO8903085  (FOX JAMES C [US]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * page 3, line 1 - line 23 * * page 12, line 9 - line 19; figure 5 * * page 26, paragraph I - page 29, paragraph III *;
 [A]JPS6266493  ;
 [A]JPS628389  ;
 [A]EP0051228  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 5,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 3 *;
 [A]US4495654  (DEISS MICHAEL S [US]) [A] 7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 22 * * column 4, line 6 - line 35; figures 1,2A *;
 [A]US3893049  (BRAY DEREK) [A] 7,8 * abstract * * column 6, line 43 - line 56 *
 [YA]  - GUNTER ZEISEL ET AL., "AN INTERACTIVE MENU-DRIVEN REMOTE CONTROL UNIT FOR TV-RECEIVERS AND VC-RECORDERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS '1988 INTERNATIOAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS,PART 1', NEW YORK (US), (198808), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 814 - 818, [Y] 3,4 * page 815, line 1 - page 816, line 25; figures 3-6 * [A] 1,2,7,8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870825), vol. 11, no. 261, Database accession no. (P - 609), [A] 5,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870609), vol. 11, no. 178, Database accession no. (P - 584), [A] 5,6 * abstract *
International search[Y]US4847696
 [Y]US4841132
 [Y]US4908713
 [Y]US4750036
 [Y]US4706121
 [YP]US4977455