Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0557362

EP0557362 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIGITAL PROJECTION LIMITED
Greenside Way
Middleton, Manchester M24 1XX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
Digital Projection Limited
Greenside Way
Middleton, Manchester M24 1XX / GB
Former [1993/35]For all designated states
RANK BRIMAR LIMITED
Greenside Way Middleton
Manchester M24 1SN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MILLWARD, John David
Rank Cintel Limited, Watton Road
Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0AE / GB
02 / GILLESPIE, John
Rank Cintel Limited, Watton Road
Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0AE / GB
[1993/35]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date91920056.818.11.1991
[1993/35]
WO1991GB02032
Priority number, dateGB1990002497816.11.1990         Original published format: GB 9024978
[1993/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9209064
Date:29.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0557362
Date:01.09.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0557362
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04N3/12, G09G3/34
[2000/06]
Former International [1993/35]G09G3/34, H04N3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1994/02]
Former [1993/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:RÄUMLICHE LICHTMODULATOREN[1993/35]
English:IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO SPATIAL LIGHT MODULATORS[1993/35]
French:AMELIORATION CONCERNANT LES MODULATEURS DE LUMIERE SPATIALE[1993/35]
Entry into regional phase21.05.1993National basic fee paid 
21.05.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
21.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
17.06.1993Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.09.1993Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, ES, GR, LU
14.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
18.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Request for further processing for:09.06.1999Request for further processing filed
09.06.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.06.1999Decision despatched
24.06.1998Request for further processing filed
24.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
13.07.1998Decision despatched
01.08.1996Request for further processing filed
01.08.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
20.08.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.07.1993CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.1993ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.1993GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.1993LI   M01   Not yet paid
21.07.1993LU   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2000
IT09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2003/45]AT09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2003/07]AT09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT09.02.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT09.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0261901
 [A]WO9003023