Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0553280 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0553280



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3857
12.08.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
19.07.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.06.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 1
25.06.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
25.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.05.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
04.05.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
03.05.2010 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 2
29.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2010 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
27.04.2010 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 2
23.03.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 7
01.03.2010 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
05.02.2010 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.02.2010 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2010 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
03.02.2010 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
01.02.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.02.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
29.01.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.11.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
27.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
26.11.2009 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
26.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 25
23.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 25
16.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.11.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.11.2009 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
10.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
28.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.10.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
20.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 72
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.10.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 44
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 58
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 66
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 58
16.10.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
14.10.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 41
11.09.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
21.08.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
19.08.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Appeal 2
19.08.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
19.08.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
12.08.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.08.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
25.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.06.2009 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 42
18.06.2009 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 13
28.05.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
15.05.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 5
15.05.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
21.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.04.2009 Drawings Opposition 2
20.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.04.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
15.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
28.11.2008 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
24.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
30.09.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 21
26.05.2008 Non-scannable object Opposition 7
26.05.2008 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
30.04.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.04.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.02.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
29.10.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.10.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.10.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
09.05.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
26.04.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.04.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
20.04.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 40
11.04.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Claims Appeal 1
04.04.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.04.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 15
02.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
29.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.03.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Appeal 9
22.03.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 14
08.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.02.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.02.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.12.2006 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
15.12.2006 F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation Appeal 2
12.12.2006 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2006 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
30.11.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.11.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.11.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
03.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.10.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
23.10.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.07.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.07.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 44
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 100
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 52
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 43
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 100
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 46
12.07.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 32
11.07.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 45
10.05.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
05.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.05.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 2
09.01.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Claims Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
29.12.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 55
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 55
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.12.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.12.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
24.11.2005 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.11.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.11.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.10.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.10.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.08.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
19.08.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
19.08.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
19.08.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
19.08.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.06.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.06.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
18.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
18.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
18.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 31
17.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.05.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 32
24.02.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.02.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
08.02.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.02.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
24.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.04.2003 Claims Opposition 2
10.04.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
28.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
25.11.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.11.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 100
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 114
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
10.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
10.10.2002 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 2
09.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
09.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
09.10.2002 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
29.11.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.09.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 3
25.07.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
14.05.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
07.05.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.02.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.02.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 103
27.04.2000 Description Search / examination 21
27.04.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2000 Description Search / examination 1
09.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.11.1999 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
22.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
22.10.1999 Description Search / examination 3
22.10.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.10.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.10.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
26.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.05.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
21.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
19.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.05.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.01.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
19.03.1998 Description Search / examination 3
19.03.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.01.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
27.01.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.01.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.07.1997 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
13.06.1997 Description Search / examination 18
13.06.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.05.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.03.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.02.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Description Search / examination 2
19.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
19.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.11.1993 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.10.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.10.1993 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
23.06.1993 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.04.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
08.05.1992 Priority document Search / examination 58
16.04.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.04.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 124
15.04.1992 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3