blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0494624

EP0494624 - Method and receiver for teletext transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/29]Improved receiver of teletext transmission
[1999/12]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EDICO S.r.l.
Via Atanasio Kircher, 7
00197 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [1994/15]For all designated states
EDICO S.r.l.
Via Atanasio Kircher, 7
I-00197 Roma / IT
Former [1992/29]For all designated states
EDICO S.r.l.
Via di Villa Emiliani, 24
I-00197 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Dini, Roberto
Via Malta 9
I-10098 Rivoli (TO) / IT
[1992/29]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date92100124.403.01.1992
[1992/29]
Priority number, dateIT1991TO0000507.01.1991         Original published format: IT TO910005
[1992/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0494624
Date:15.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0494624
Date:17.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0494624
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/087
[1992/29]
CPC:
H04N7/0882 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1992/29]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Empfänger für Teletextübertragungen[1999/12]
English:Method and receiver for teletext transmission[1999/12]
French:Procédé et récepteur de transmissions de télétexte[1999/12]
Former [1992/29]Verbesserter Empfänger für Teletextübertragungen
Former [1992/29]Improved receiver of teletext transmission
Former [1992/29]Récepteur de transmissions de télétexte amélioré
MiscellaneousEPB 1992/41: (deleted)
EPB 1992/29: The declaration of priority referedto has the number TO91A000005, and was filed in Italy on 07.01.91.
Examination procedure10.09.1993Examination requested  [1993/47]
06.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.1997Date of oral proceedings
08.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.12.1997Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.09.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1998Fee for grant paid
21.12.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999  10.07.2003  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999  10.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Leibnizstrasse 6
95447 Bayreuth / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/49]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999  10.07.2003  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999  10.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999  10.07.2003  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999  10.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2007/01]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999  10.07.2003  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999  10.11.2006  WITHDRAWN
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2003/37]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999  10.07.2003  WITHDRAWN
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999  18.01.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
Former [2000/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.1999   
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Schmitz, Herman Jan Renier
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  24.12.1999    WITHDRAWN
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23
96317 Kronach / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.02.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.11.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
08.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.01.2003Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.02.2007Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
26.02.2007Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/27]
Appeal following opposition27.02.2003Appeal received No.  T0281/03
23.05.2003Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/47]
29.11.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/49]
17.05.2006Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
30.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0264565  (BAYERISCHE RUNDFUNKWERBUNG [DE]);
 [E]EP0468447  (RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA [IT])
 [Y]  - RUNDFUNKTECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN vol. 31, no. 2, 30 April 1987, NORDERSTEDT DE pages 83 - 93 VON GERHARD EITZ ET AL 'TOP - Ein Verfahren zur vereinfachten Anwahl von Fernsehtext-Tafeln durch den Zuschauer'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.